SFC Licences of FLORO Jeff Rey
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
FE Advisory Asia Limited 斐信顧問亞洲有限公司 | RO | 4 | 18 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 |
Morningstar Investment Management Asia Limited | RE | 4 | 11 December 2015 | 02 March 2018 |