SFC Licences of SAITOWITZ Paul
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Marshall Wace Asia Limited | RE | 9 | 17 June 2019 | 04 November 2021 |
Oasis Management (Hong Kong) | RE | 9 | 24 October 2016 | 08 March 2019 |
Oasis Management (Hong Kong) | RE | 4 | 24 October 2016 | 08 March 2019 |
Oasis Management (Hong Kong) | RE | 5 | 24 October 2016 | 08 March 2019 |