SFC Licenceholders of Oasis Management (Hong Kong)
- OasisCompliance@hk.oasiscm.com
- Website
- www.oasiscm.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
AGARWAL Barun | RE | 9 | 05 March 2009 | 16 August 2011 |
AGARWAL Barun | RE | 5 | 05 March 2009 | 16 August 2011 |
AGARWAL Barun | RE | 4 | 05 March 2009 | 16 August 2011 |
AGARWAL Barun | RO | 4 | 14 September 2004 | 05 March 2009 |
AGARWAL Barun | RO | 5 | 14 September 2004 | 05 March 2009 |
AGARWAL Barun | RO | 9 | 14 September 2004 | 05 March 2009 |
BRICK Freddy Saul | RE | 9 | 25 March 2011 | 27 May 2013 |
BRICK Freddy Saul | RE | 5 | 25 March 2011 | 27 May 2013 |
BRICK Freddy Saul | RE | 4 | 25 March 2011 | 27 May 2013 |
CHAN Joey 陳祖兒 | RE | 5 | 22 February 2016 | 27 May 2016 |
CHAN Joey 陳祖兒 | RE | 9 | 22 February 2016 | 27 May 2016 |
CHAN Joey 陳祖兒 | RE | 4 | 22 February 2016 | 27 May 2016 |
CHANG Yee Hyun | RE | 4 | 13 August 2024 | |
CHANG Yee Hyun | RE | 9 | 13 August 2024 | |
CHANG Yee Hyun | RE | 5 | 13 August 2024 | |
CHEN Fei 陳飛 | RE | 5 | 11 March 2008 | 30 October 2008 |
CHEN Fei 陳飛 | RE | 4 | 11 March 2008 | 30 October 2008 |
CHEN Fei 陳飛 | RE | 9 | 11 March 2008 | 30 October 2008 |
CHEN Stanley | RE | 5 | 05 October 2007 | 30 October 2008 |
CHEN Stanley | RE | 4 | 05 October 2007 | 30 October 2008 |
CHEN Stanley | RE | 9 | 05 October 2007 | 30 October 2008 |
CHEN Tian Yi 陳天翼 | RE | 9 | 14 December 2018 | 28 February 2019 |
CHEN Tian Yi 陳天翼 | RE | 5 | 14 December 2018 | 28 February 2019 |
CHEN Tian Yi 陳天翼 | RE | 4 | 14 December 2018 | 28 February 2019 |
CHEN Yifan 陳一帆 | RE | 4 | 19 November 2018 | 31 December 2021 |
CHEN Yifan 陳一帆 | RE | 5 | 19 November 2018 | 31 December 2021 |
CHEN Yifan 陳一帆 | RE | 9 | 19 November 2018 | 31 December 2021 |
CHEUNG Chi Hin, Cyrus 張子軒 | RE | 9 | 01 August 2016 | 24 November 2023 |
CHEUNG Chi Hin, Cyrus 張子軒 | RE | 4 | 01 August 2016 | 24 November 2023 |
CHEUNG Chi Hin, Cyrus 張子軒 | RE | 5 | 01 August 2016 | 24 November 2023 |
CHUNG Tak Yee, Samantha 鍾德懿 | RE | 9 | 04 September 2006 | 25 July 2007 |
CHUNG Tak Yee, Samantha 鍾德懿 | RE | 4 | 04 September 2006 | 25 July 2007 |
CHUNG Tak Yee, Samantha 鍾德懿 | RE | 5 | 04 September 2006 | 25 July 2007 |
DE SAINT-EXUPERY Jinus | RE | 9 | 16 October 2007 | 29 November 2007 |
DOMNITZ Yonatan Avram | RE | 4 | 16 July 2012 | |
DOMNITZ Yonatan Avram | RE | 5 | 16 July 2012 | |
DOMNITZ Yonatan Avram | RE | 9 | 16 July 2012 | |
FISCHER Seth Hillel | RO | 9 | 11 September 2008 | |
FISCHER Seth Hillel | RO | 5 | 11 September 2008 | |
FISCHER Seth Hillel | RO | 4 | 11 September 2008 | |
FISCHER Seth Hillel | RE | 4 | 12 April 2006 | 11 September 2008 |
FISCHER Seth Hillel | RE | 5 | 12 April 2006 | 11 September 2008 |
FISCHER Seth Hillel | RE | 9 | 12 April 2006 | 11 September 2008 |
FONG Tsz Kam, Jacob 方梓鑑 | RE | 9 | 04 October 2012 | |
FONG Tsz Kam, Jacob 方梓鑑 | RE | 5 | 04 October 2012 | |
FONG Tsz Kam, Jacob 方梓鑑 | RE | 4 | 04 October 2012 | |
FOO Hui Fang 符慧芳 | RE | 4 | 05 July 2007 | 30 October 2008 |
FOO Hui Fang 符慧芳 | RE | 9 | 05 July 2007 | 30 October 2008 |
FOO Hui Fang 符慧芳 | RE | 5 | 05 July 2007 | 30 October 2008 |
GHOZALI Nasrine Khadidja | RO | 9 | 13 May 2016 | |
GHOZALI Nasrine Khadidja | RE | 4 | 17 March 2016 | 13 May 2016 |
GHOZALI Nasrine Khadidja | RE | 5 | 17 March 2016 | 13 May 2016 |
GHOZALI Nasrine Khadidja | RE | 9 | 17 March 2016 | 13 May 2016 |
GHOZALI Nasrine Khadidja | RO | 4 | 13 May 2016 | |
GHOZALI Nasrine Khadidja | RO | 5 | 13 May 2016 | |
GHOZALI Nasrine Khadidja | RE | 4 | 12 August 2008 | 05 March 2010 |
GHOZALI Nasrine Khadidja | RE | 5 | 12 August 2008 | 05 March 2010 |
GHOZALI Nasrine Khadidja | RE | 9 | 12 August 2008 | 05 March 2010 |
GILL Kevin | RE | 9 | 23 March 2006 | 31 March 2007 |
GILL Kevin | RE | 5 | 23 March 2006 | 31 March 2007 |
GILL Kevin | RE | 4 | 23 March 2006 | 31 March 2007 |
GUAN Ruicheng 管瑞成 | RE | 9 | 28 July 2020 | |
GUAN Ruicheng 管瑞成 | RE | 5 | 28 July 2020 | |
GUAN Ruicheng 管瑞成 | RE | 4 | 28 July 2020 | |
GUPTA Anurag | RE | 9 | 19 December 2006 | 30 June 2016 |
GUPTA Anurag | RE | 5 | 19 December 2006 | 30 June 2016 |
GUPTA Anurag | RE | 4 | 19 December 2006 | 30 June 2016 |
HALL Taylor Amanda | RE | 9 | 23 January 2018 | 02 June 2022 |
HALL Taylor Amanda | RE | 5 | 23 January 2018 | 02 June 2022 |
HALL Taylor Amanda | RE | 4 | 23 January 2018 | 02 June 2022 |
HSU Jonathan Shawn 許瑞生 | RE | 4 | 18 October 2007 | 05 September 2008 |
HSU Jonathan Shawn 許瑞生 | RE | 9 | 18 October 2007 | 05 September 2008 |
HSU Jonathan Shawn 許瑞生 | RE | 5 | 18 October 2007 | 05 September 2008 |
HUANG Rawen Zhi Hong 黃志鴻 | RO | 9 | 13 July 2020 | 30 November 2022 |
HUANG Rawen Zhi Hong 黃志鴻 | RE | 5 | 16 September 2019 | 30 November 2022 |
HUANG Rawen Zhi Hong 黃志鴻 | RE | 4 | 16 September 2019 | 30 November 2022 |
HUANG Rawen Zhi Hong 黃志鴻 | RE | 9 | 23 July 2018 | 13 July 2020 |
HUANG Rawen Zhi Hong 黃志鴻 | RE | 4 | 22 May 2012 | 25 August 2014 |
HUANG Rawen Zhi Hong 黃志鴻 | RE | 5 | 22 May 2012 | 25 August 2014 |
HUANG Rawen Zhi Hong 黃志鴻 | RE | 9 | 22 May 2012 | 25 August 2014 |
ITO Junichi | RE | 9 | 28 February 2014 | 08 December 2014 |
ITO Junichi | RE | 5 | 28 February 2014 | 08 December 2014 |
ITO Junichi | RE | 4 | 28 February 2014 | 08 December 2014 |
KANAI Kentaro 金井健太郎 | RE | 9 | 28 November 2018 | 05 March 2020 |
KANAI Kentaro 金井健太郎 | RE | 5 | 28 November 2018 | 05 March 2020 |
KANAI Kentaro 金井健太郎 | RE | 4 | 28 November 2018 | 05 March 2020 |
KANEKO Satsuki | RE | 4 | 04 August 2006 | 11 February 2009 |
KANEKO Satsuki | RE | 9 | 04 August 2006 | 11 February 2009 |
KANEKO Satsuki | RE | 5 | 04 August 2006 | 11 February 2009 |
KENTER Joshua Kyle | RE | 9 | 09 March 2009 | 06 July 2009 |
KENTER Joshua Kyle | RE | 5 | 09 March 2009 | 06 July 2009 |
KENTER Joshua Kyle | RE | 4 | 09 March 2009 | 06 July 2009 |
KHATRI Waqas A | RE | 9 | 20 June 2007 | 07 June 2010 |
KHATRI Waqas A | RE | 5 | 20 June 2007 | 07 June 2010 |
KHATRI Waqas A | RE | 4 | 20 June 2007 | 07 June 2010 |
KIM Dae Ho | RE | 4 | 25 May 2007 | 01 January 2008 |
KIM Dae Ho | RE | 5 | 25 May 2007 | 01 January 2008 |
KIM Dae Ho | RE | 9 | 25 May 2007 | 01 January 2008 |
KO Denise Chi Heng 高志恆 | RE | 9 | 12 November 2012 | 04 April 2014 |
KO Denise Chi Heng 高志恆 | RE | 5 | 12 November 2012 | 04 April 2014 |
KO Denise Chi Heng 高志恆 | RE | 4 | 12 November 2012 | 04 April 2014 |
KO Denise Chi Heng 高志恆 | RE | 9 | 30 March 2011 | 20 May 2012 |
KO Denise Chi Heng 高志恆 | RE | 5 | 30 March 2011 | 20 May 2012 |
KO Denise Chi Heng 高志恆 | RE | 4 | 30 March 2011 | 20 May 2012 |
KO Denise Chi Heng 高志恆 | RE | 4 | 14 August 2007 | 03 March 2009 |
KO Denise Chi Heng 高志恆 | RE | 5 | 14 August 2007 | 03 March 2009 |
KO Denise Chi Heng 高志恆 | RE | 9 | 14 August 2007 | 03 March 2009 |
KOO Hung Yuan, Kevin 顧弘源 | RE | 4 | 05 August 2005 | 04 May 2007 |
KOO Hung Yuan, Kevin 顧弘源 | RE | 5 | 05 August 2005 | 04 May 2007 |
KOO Hung Yuan, Kevin 顧弘源 | RE | 9 | 01 August 2006 | 04 May 2007 |
KWOK Wai Ting, Wendy 郭瑋婷 | RE | 9 | 20 June 2018 | 20 February 2019 |
LAM Kuen 林娟 | RE | 9 | 16 May 2006 | 04 December 2008 |
LAM Kuen 林娟 | RE | 5 | 16 May 2006 | 04 December 2008 |
LAM Kuen 林娟 | RE | 4 | 16 May 2006 | 04 December 2008 |
LEE Seung Hoon | RE | 9 | 11 March 2008 | 04 September 2008 |
LEE Seung Hoon | RE | 4 | 11 March 2008 | 04 September 2008 |
LEE Seung Hoon | RE | 5 | 11 March 2008 | 04 September 2008 |
LEUNG Andrew Hong-chuen 梁匡全 | RE | 4 | 01 June 2015 | |
LEUNG Andrew Hong-chuen 梁匡全 | RE | 5 | 01 June 2015 | |
LEUNG Andrew Hong-chuen 梁匡全 | RE | 9 | 01 June 2015 | |
LEUNG Karen Hoi Huen 梁愷昍 | RE | 5 | 22 January 2007 | 10 February 2012 |
LEUNG Karen Hoi Huen 梁愷昍 | RE | 9 | 22 January 2007 | 10 February 2012 |
LEUNG Karen Hoi Huen 梁愷昍 | RE | 4 | 22 January 2007 | 10 February 2012 |
LI Tze Fung, Patrick 李子鋒 | RO | 9 | 23 March 2010 | |
LI Tze Fung, Patrick 李子鋒 | RO | 5 | 23 March 2010 | |
LI Tze Fung, Patrick 李子鋒 | RO | 4 | 23 March 2010 | |
LI Tze Fung, Patrick 李子鋒 | RE | 4 | 14 August 2007 | 23 March 2010 |
LI Tze Fung, Patrick 李子鋒 | RE | 5 | 14 August 2007 | 23 March 2010 |
LI Tze Fung, Patrick 李子鋒 | RE | 9 | 14 August 2007 | 23 March 2010 |
LOW Michael Brian | RE | 9 | 15 May 2006 | 18 December 2009 |
LOW Michael Brian | RE | 5 | 15 May 2006 | 18 December 2009 |
LOW Michael Brian | RE | 4 | 15 May 2006 | 18 December 2009 |
LUO Yiwen 羅儀雯 | RE | 4 | 30 August 2016 | 09 December 2016 |
LUO Yiwen 羅儀雯 | RE | 5 | 30 August 2016 | 09 December 2016 |
LUO Yiwen 羅儀雯 | RE | 9 | 30 August 2016 | 09 December 2016 |
MA Jui Hsiang 馬瑞祥 | RE | 5 | 28 July 2008 | 31 March 2010 |
MA Jui Hsiang 馬瑞祥 | RE | 4 | 28 July 2008 | 31 March 2010 |
MA Jui Hsiang 馬瑞祥 | RE | 9 | 28 July 2008 | 31 March 2010 |
MAK Hon Kuen, Peter 麥漢權 | RE | 9 | 23 March 2006 | 11 August 2006 |
MAK Hon Kuen, Peter 麥漢權 | RE | 5 | 23 March 2006 | 11 August 2006 |
MAK Hon Kuen, Peter 麥漢權 | RE | 4 | 23 March 2006 | 11 August 2006 |
MATSUMOTO Iori | RE | 4 | 20 January 2020 | 01 May 2024 |
MATSUMOTO Iori | RE | 5 | 20 January 2020 | 01 May 2024 |
MATSUMOTO Iori | RE | 9 | 20 January 2020 | 01 May 2024 |
MCCREIGHT Edward Robert | RE | 9 | 27 December 2007 | 18 September 2008 |
MCCREIGHT Edward Robert | RE | 5 | 27 December 2007 | 18 September 2008 |
MCCREIGHT Edward Robert | RE | 4 | 27 December 2007 | 18 September 2008 |
MCCREIGHT Edward Robert | RO | 5 | 18 September 2008 | 31 March 2010 |
MCCREIGHT Edward Robert | RO | 9 | 18 September 2008 | 31 March 2010 |
MCCREIGHT Edward Robert | RO | 4 | 18 September 2008 | 31 March 2010 |
MEYER Phillip Michael | RO | 9 | 07 June 2022 | |
MEYER Phillip Michael | RO | 5 | 07 June 2022 | |
MEYER Phillip Michael | RO | 4 | 07 June 2022 | |
MIYAZAKI-ROSS James Masami 宮崎正巳 | RE | 9 | 31 March 2023 | |
MIYAZAKI-ROSS James Masami 宮崎正巳 | RE | 5 | 31 March 2023 | |
MIYAZAKI-ROSS James Masami 宮崎正巳 | RE | 4 | 31 March 2023 | |
MORRIS Robert 銘陽 | RE | 9 | 05 December 2016 | |
MORRIS Robert 銘陽 | RE | 4 | 05 December 2016 | |
MORRIS Robert 銘陽 | RE | 5 | 05 December 2016 | |
NEMET-NEJAT Rafael Jacob | RE | 4 | 02 June 2006 | 30 July 2008 |
NEMET-NEJAT Rafael Jacob | RE | 5 | 02 June 2006 | 30 July 2008 |
NEMET-NEJAT Rafael Jacob | RE | 9 | 02 June 2006 | 30 July 2008 |
NG Gordon Ching Hang 吳政亨 | RE | 9 | 05 June 2014 | 22 September 2016 |
NG Gordon Ching Hang 吳政亨 | RE | 5 | 05 June 2014 | 22 September 2016 |
NG Gordon Ching Hang 吳政亨 | RE | 4 | 05 June 2014 | 22 September 2016 |
ONG Boon Kin, Lloyd 王文景 | RE | 4 | 16 June 2008 | 10 February 2009 |
ONG Boon Kin, Lloyd 王文景 | RE | 9 | 16 June 2008 | 10 February 2009 |
ONG Boon Kin, Lloyd 王文景 | RE | 5 | 16 June 2008 | 10 February 2009 |
ONG Hsing Jen, Eddie | RE | 4 | 19 December 2006 | 02 January 2008 |
ONG Hsing Jen, Eddie | RE | 5 | 19 December 2006 | 02 January 2008 |
ONG Hsing Jen, Eddie | RE | 9 | 19 December 2006 | 02 January 2008 |
PAN Jiayi 潘嘉毅 | RE | 9 | 05 October 2022 | |
PAN Jiayi 潘嘉毅 | RE | 5 | 05 October 2022 | |
PAN Jiayi 潘嘉毅 | RE | 4 | 05 October 2022 | |
ROSENBLATT Jason Michael | RE | 4 | 28 February 2007 | 05 March 2010 |
ROSENBLATT Jason Michael | RE | 5 | 28 February 2007 | 05 March 2010 |
ROSENBLATT Jason Michael | RE | 9 | 28 February 2007 | 05 March 2010 |
SAITOWITZ Paul | RE | 4 | 24 October 2016 | 08 March 2019 |
SAITOWITZ Paul | RE | 5 | 24 October 2016 | 08 March 2019 |
SAITOWITZ Paul | RE | 9 | 24 October 2016 | 08 March 2019 |
SHANMUGANATHAN Rajesh | RE | 9 | 18 January 2008 | 05 September 2011 |
SHIGAKI Takuya | RE | 9 | 28 June 2017 | 15 June 2018 |
SHIGAKI Takuya | RE | 5 | 28 June 2017 | 15 June 2018 |
SHIGAKI Takuya | RE | 4 | 28 June 2017 | 15 June 2018 |
SHOGHI Alexander Azim | RO | 9 | 23 March 2010 | 09 February 2012 |
SHOGHI Alexander Azim | RO | 5 | 23 March 2010 | 09 February 2012 |
SHOGHI Alexander Azim | RO | 4 | 23 March 2010 | 09 February 2012 |
SHOGHI Alexander Azim | RE | 4 | 23 March 2006 | 23 March 2010 |
SHOGHI Alexander Azim | RE | 5 | 23 March 2006 | 23 March 2010 |
SHOGHI Alexander Azim | RE | 9 | 23 March 2006 | 23 March 2010 |
TAKAHASHI Akane | RE | 9 | 20 January 2023 | |
TAKAHASHI Akane | RE | 5 | 20 January 2023 | |
TAKAHASHI Akane | RE | 4 | 20 January 2023 | |
TAN Christopher Nghee Huat | RE | 5 | 05 October 2007 | 27 June 2008 |
TAN Christopher Nghee Huat | RE | 4 | 05 October 2007 | 27 June 2008 |
TAN Christopher Nghee Huat | RE | 9 | 05 October 2007 | 27 June 2008 |
TAN Wee Lee 陳偉利 | RE | 5 | 18 January 2008 | 03 March 2010 |
TAN Wee Lee 陳偉利 | RE | 9 | 18 January 2008 | 03 March 2010 |
TAN Wee Lee 陳偉利 | RE | 4 | 18 January 2008 | 03 March 2010 |
TANG Marvin Chak Yuen 鄧澤源 | RE | 4 | 09 September 2013 | |
TANG Marvin Chak Yuen 鄧澤源 | RE | 5 | 09 September 2013 | |
TANG Marvin Chak Yuen 鄧澤源 | RE | 9 | 09 September 2013 | |
TU James Xinjun | RO | 9 | 14 September 2004 | 21 December 2009 |
TU James Xinjun | RO | 5 | 14 September 2004 | 21 December 2009 |
TU James Xinjun | RO | 4 | 14 September 2004 | 21 December 2009 |
UTSUMI Soichi | RE | 5 | 27 June 2016 | 30 June 2018 |
UTSUMI Soichi | RE | 4 | 27 June 2016 | 30 June 2018 |
UTSUMI Soichi | RE | 9 | 27 June 2016 | 30 June 2018 |
WEINGARTEN Assaf Vivian | RE | 5 | 23 December 2020 | |
WEINGARTEN Assaf Vivian | RE | 4 | 23 December 2020 | |
WEINGARTEN Assaf Vivian | RE | 9 | 26 November 2020 | |
WONG Man Yee Paula 黃雯誼 | RE | 9 | 27 December 2007 | 30 October 2008 |
WONG Man Yee Paula 黃雯誼 | RE | 5 | 27 December 2007 | 30 October 2008 |
WONG Man Yee Paula 黃雯誼 | RE | 4 | 27 December 2007 | 30 October 2008 |
WOSNER Daniel Charles | RE | 5 | 14 October 2016 | |
WOSNER Daniel Charles | RE | 9 | 03 May 2016 | |
WOSNER Daniel Charles | RE | 4 | 03 May 2016 | |
WU Ronald Ka Wai 吳嘉偉 | RE | 9 | 17 February 2021 | |
WU Ronald Ka Wai 吳嘉偉 | RE | 5 | 17 February 2021 | |
WU Ronald Ka Wai 吳嘉偉 | RE | 4 | 17 February 2021 | |
YU Wai Kwan, Tina 余慧君 | RE | 4 | 27 July 2007 | 09 February 2009 |
YU Wai Kwan, Tina 余慧君 | RE | 5 | 27 July 2007 | 09 February 2009 |
YU Wai Kwan, Tina 余慧君 | RE | 9 | 27 July 2007 | 09 February 2009 |
ZENG Binwei 曾彬瑋 | RE | 9 | 07 November 2018 | |
ZENG Binwei 曾彬瑋 | RE | 5 | 07 November 2018 | |
ZENG Binwei 曾彬瑋 | RE | 4 | 25 October 2018 | |
ZHANG Jingting 張婧婷 | RE | 9 | 10 June 2019 | 31 December 2021 |
ZHANG Jingting 張婧婷 | RE | 5 | 10 June 2019 | 31 December 2021 |
ZHANG Jingting 張婧婷 | RE | 4 | 10 June 2019 | 31 December 2021 |
ZHU Jiayi 朱佳懿 | RE | 9 | 20 November 2017 | 30 November 2022 |
ZHU Jiayi 朱佳懿 | RE | 5 | 20 November 2017 | 30 November 2022 |
ZHU Jiayi 朱佳懿 | RE | 4 | 20 November 2017 | 30 November 2022 |
ZUO Jie 左杰 | RE | 9 | 28 March 2013 | 17 May 2016 |
ZUO Jie 左杰 | RE | 5 | 28 March 2013 | 17 May 2016 |
ZUO Jie 左杰 | RE | 4 | 28 March 2013 | 17 May 2016 |