SFC Licences of WONG Hong Ming 黃康銘
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Easy Fund Management Company Limited 易昇基金管理有限公司 | RO | 9 | 22 May 2024 | |
Easy Fund Management Company Limited 易昇基金管理有限公司 | RO | 4 | 22 May 2024 | |
D&R International Capital Management (Hong Kong) Limited 達仁國際資本管理(香港)有限公司 | RO | 9 | 04 May 2020 | 26 March 2024 |
D&R International Capital Management (Hong Kong) Limited 達仁國際資本管理(香港)有限公司 | RO | 4 | 04 May 2020 | 26 March 2024 |
D&R International Capital Management (Hong Kong) Limited 達仁國際資本管理(香港)有限公司 | RO | 1 | 04 May 2020 | 26 March 2024 |
D&R International Capital Management (Hong Kong) Limited 達仁國際資本管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 03 January 2017 | 04 May 2020 |
D&R International Capital Management (Hong Kong) Limited 達仁國際資本管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 03 January 2017 | 04 May 2020 |
D&R International Capital Management (Hong Kong) Limited 達仁國際資本管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 03 January 2017 | 04 May 2020 |