SFC Licenceholders of D&R International Capital Management (Hong Kong) Limited 達仁國際資本管理(香港)有限公司
- admin@darenfundhk.com
- Website
- www.darenfund.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHAN Siu Ming 陳兆明 | RO | 9 | 14 May 2019 | 12 March 2024 |
CHAN Siu Ming 陳兆明 | RO | 4 | 04 April 2018 | 12 March 2024 |
CHAN Siu Ming 陳兆明 | RO | 1 | 04 April 2018 | 12 March 2024 |
CHAN Siu Ming 陳兆明 | RE | 9 | 23 March 2018 | 14 May 2019 |
CHAN Siu Ming 陳兆明 | RE | 1 | 10 November 2017 | 04 April 2018 |
CHEN Chen 陳晨 | RE | 4 | 11 February 2015 | 06 November 2015 |
CHEN Chen 陳晨 | RE | 1 | 11 February 2015 | 06 November 2015 |
CHOI Yong | RO | 9 | 16 July 2019 | 12 February 2024 |
CHOI Yong | RO | 4 | 16 July 2019 | 12 February 2024 |
CHOI Yong | RO | 1 | 16 July 2019 | 12 February 2024 |
CHOI Yong | RE | 9 | 17 June 2019 | 16 July 2019 |
CHOI Yong | RE | 4 | 17 June 2019 | 16 July 2019 |
CHOI Yong | RE | 1 | 17 June 2019 | 16 July 2019 |
CHOI Yong | RO | 9 | 26 May 2016 | 06 April 2018 |
CHOI Yong | RO | 4 | 14 April 2016 | 06 April 2018 |
CHOI Yong | RO | 1 | 14 April 2016 | 06 April 2018 |
LEE Alex Yapp 李立德 | RE | 4 | 21 April 2015 | 18 May 2016 |
LEE Alex Yapp 李立德 | RE | 1 | 21 April 2015 | 18 May 2016 |
LEE Man Kit, Peter 李文傑 | RO | 9 | 26 May 2016 | 20 February 2017 |
LEE Man Kit, Peter 李文傑 | RO | 4 | 14 April 2016 | 14 November 2016 |
LEE Man Kit, Peter 李文傑 | RO | 1 | 14 April 2016 | 14 November 2016 |
LI Yong 李勇 | RE | 9 | 28 November 2017 | 16 October 2018 |
LI Yong 李勇 | RE | 4 | 28 November 2017 | 16 October 2018 |
LI Yong 李勇 | RE | 1 | 28 November 2017 | 16 October 2018 |
LUO John Zhan | RO | 9 | 26 May 2016 | 15 December 2018 |
LUO John Zhan | RO | 4 | 25 September 2015 | 15 December 2018 |
LUO John Zhan | RO | 1 | 25 September 2015 | 15 December 2018 |
PEI Yunbo 裴云波 | RO | 9 | 05 November 2018 | 13 March 2020 |
PEI Yunbo 裴云波 | RO | 4 | 05 November 2018 | 13 March 2020 |
PEI Yunbo 裴云波 | RO | 1 | 05 November 2018 | 13 March 2020 |
SIU Wai Ching, Shirley 蕭慧晶 | RE | 4 | 18 May 2016 | 22 June 2017 |
SIU Wai Ching, Shirley 蕭慧晶 | RE | 1 | 18 May 2016 | 22 June 2017 |
SOONG Yuk Lun, Gary 宋煜麟 | RO | 9 | 31 July 2018 | 31 March 2019 |
SOONG Yuk Lun, Gary 宋煜麟 | RO | 4 | 31 July 2018 | 31 March 2019 |
SOONG Yuk Lun, Gary 宋煜麟 | RO | 1 | 31 July 2018 | 31 March 2019 |
TSE Wai Man 謝慧敏 | RO | 4 | 30 January 2015 | 30 April 2016 |
TSE Wai Man 謝慧敏 | RO | 1 | 30 January 2015 | 30 April 2016 |
WONG Hong Ming 黃康銘 | RO | 9 | 04 May 2020 | 26 March 2024 |
WONG Hong Ming 黃康銘 | RO | 4 | 04 May 2020 | 26 March 2024 |
WONG Hong Ming 黃康銘 | RO | 1 | 04 May 2020 | 26 March 2024 |
WONG Hong Ming 黃康銘 | RE | 9 | 03 January 2017 | 04 May 2020 |
WONG Hong Ming 黃康銘 | RE | 4 | 03 January 2017 | 04 May 2020 |
WONG Hong Ming 黃康銘 | RE | 1 | 03 January 2017 | 04 May 2020 |
ZHANG BROGLE Jing | RO | 4 | 30 January 2015 | 31 July 2015 |
ZHANG BROGLE Jing | RO | 1 | 30 January 2015 | 31 July 2015 |