SFC Licences of ZHOU Qinyi 周沁艺
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Valuable Asset Management Limited 華盛資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 21 September 2022 | |
Valuable Asset Management Limited 華盛資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 21 September 2022 | |
Wonderland International Asset Management Limited 華德國際資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 27 August 2021 | 11 June 2022 |
Beta International Securities Limited 貝塔國際證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 13 January 2021 | 11 June 2022 |
Beta International Securities Limited 貝塔國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 13 January 2021 | 11 June 2022 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 4 | 25 July 2017 | 14 June 2019 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 1 | 25 July 2017 | 14 June 2019 |