SFC Licences of BHALLA Sumeet Kumar
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Marshall Wace Asia Limited | RE | 9 | 23 April 2024 | 22 July 2024 |
Wellington Management Hong Kong Limited 威靈頓管理香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2024 |
Wellington Management Hong Kong Limited 威靈頓管理香港有限公司 | RE | 1 | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2024 |
East Capital Asia Limited | RE | 9 | 11 July 2019 | 30 April 2020 |
East Capital Asia Limited | RE | 4 | 11 July 2019 | 30 April 2020 |
Goldman Sachs Asset Management (Hong Kong) Limited 高盛資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 25 October 2017 | 27 November 2018 |
Goldman Sachs Asset Management (Hong Kong) Limited 高盛資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 25 October 2017 | 27 November 2018 |