SFC Licences of LEUNG Man Hei 梁文憙
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 4 | 11 April 2023 | 07 June 2023 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 2 | 20 December 2021 | 07 June 2023 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 1 | 20 December 2021 | 07 June 2023 |
HGNH International Securities Co., Limited 橫華國際証券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 06 November 2020 | 19 November 2021 |
HGNH International Futures Co., Limited 橫華國際期貨有限公司 | RE | 2 | 06 November 2020 | 19 November 2021 |