SFC Licences of WEN Kit Kenny 温傑
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
KGI Asia Limited 凱基證券亞洲有限公司 | RO | 4 | 16 August 2022 | |
KGI Asia Limited 凱基證券亞洲有限公司 | RE | 4 | 14 June 2022 | 16 August 2022 |
KGI Asia Limited 凱基證券亞洲有限公司 | RE | 1 | 14 June 2022 | |
KGI Asset Management Limited 凱基資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 14 June 2022 | |
China Everbright Research Limited 中國光大資料研究有限公司 | RO | 4 | 03 May 2018 | 31 May 2022 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 24 August 2016 | 31 May 2022 |
Bright Fund Management Limited 光明投資管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 16 August 2016 | 31 May 2022 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 13 January 2014 | 31 May 2022 |
iBest Consultants Limited | RE | 9 | 24 March 2005 | 30 April 2008 |
iBest Consultants Limited | RE | 4 | 22 March 2005 | 30 April 2008 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 25 May 2004 | 01 March 2005 |