SFC Licences of TU Wen-chi 凃文棋
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Delftware Capital Management (HK) Limited 德衛奧資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RO | 9 | 16 April 2024 | |
Delftware Capital Management (HK) Limited 德衛奧資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RO | 4 | 16 April 2024 | |
Delftware Capital Management (HK) Limited 德衛奧資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 11 March 2024 | 16 April 2024 |
Delftware Capital Management (HK) Limited 德衛奧資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 11 March 2024 | 16 April 2024 |
UCAP Securities (HK) Limited 佑聯證券有限公司 | RE | 9 | 15 July 2021 | 31 October 2023 |
UCAP Securities (HK) Limited 佑聯證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 15 July 2021 | 31 October 2023 |
UCAP Securities (HK) Limited 佑聯證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 15 July 2021 | 31 October 2023 |
Open Securities Limited 開盤證券有限公司 | RE | 9 | 27 February 2004 | 06 July 2004 |
Open Securities Limited 開盤證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 27 February 2004 | 06 July 2004 |
Open Asset Management Limited 開盤資産管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 27 February 2004 | 06 July 2004 |