SFC Licenceholders of Open Asset Management Limited 開盤資産管理有限公司
- comply@opensecltd.com
- Website
- www.opensecltd.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHAN Ki Yin 陳其延 | RE | 9 | 11 June 2013 | 03 January 2014 |
CHANG Cheng Chi 張震極 | RE | 4 | 11 February 2004 | 05 October 2005 |
CHEN Yat Sun 陳一新 | RO | 4 | 19 June 2013 | 09 March 2014 |
CHEN Yat Sun 陳一新 | RO | 9 | 26 February 2013 | 09 March 2014 |
CHEN Yat Sun 陳一新 | RE | 9 | 15 January 2013 | 26 February 2013 |
CHEN Yinyi 陳引怡 | RE | 9 | 08 August 2011 | 30 October 2012 |
CHEN Yinyi 陳引怡 | RE | 4 | 08 August 2011 | 30 October 2012 |
CHENG Hung Tai 鄭宏泰 | RO | 9 | 18 April 2017 | 14 March 2018 |
CHENG Hung Tai 鄭宏泰 | RO | 4 | 18 April 2017 | 14 March 2018 |
CHENG Vincent Wai Sun 鄭尉燊 | RE | 9 | 26 May 2016 | 13 July 2017 |
CHENG Vincent Wai Sun 鄭尉燊 | RE | 4 | 26 May 2016 | 13 July 2017 |
CHIANG Shih-wei 江仕偉 | RE | 4 | 06 July 2009 | 12 August 2009 |
CHIANG Shih-wei 江仕偉 | RO | 4 | 02 March 2009 | 06 July 2009 |
CHIN Hung Tung 金宏東 | RE | 9 | 07 January 2014 | 12 June 2014 |
CHUANG I-Chu 莊易築 | RO | 4 | 20 November 2007 | 02 October 2009 |
CHUANG I-Chu 莊易築 | RE | 4 | 02 November 2007 | 20 November 2007 |
DOU Jianjun 竇建軍 | RO | 9 | 25 November 2022 | |
DOU Jianjun 竇建軍 | RO | 4 | 25 November 2022 | |
DOU Jianjun 竇建軍 | RE | 9 | 03 October 2022 | 25 November 2022 |
DOU Jianjun 竇建軍 | RE | 4 | 03 October 2022 | 25 November 2022 |
FU Weiguo 傅伟国 | RO | 9 | 09 February 2024 | |
FU Weiguo 傅伟国 | RO | 4 | 09 February 2024 | |
FU Weiguo 傅伟国 | RE | 9 | 25 January 2024 | 09 February 2024 |
FU Weiguo 傅伟国 | RE | 4 | 25 January 2024 | 09 February 2024 |
GAO Meng 高萌 | RE | 9 | 07 June 2023 | |
GAO Meng 高萌 | RE | 4 | 07 June 2023 | |
HE Chuangli 何闖立 | RE | 9 | 15 September 2014 | 06 March 2015 |
HO Kim Kwong 何劍剛 | RO | 9 | 09 June 2014 | 30 September 2015 |
HO Kim Kwong 何劍剛 | RE | 4 | 14 May 2014 | 30 September 2015 |
HO Kim Kwong 何劍剛 | RE | 9 | 14 May 2014 | 09 June 2014 |
HSU Jung-hsuan 徐榕軒 | RE | 9 | 04 September 2017 | 30 July 2020 |
HUANG Shao Hsuan 黃劭萱 | RE | 4 | 03 January 2013 | 16 May 2014 |
HUANG Shao Hsuan 黃劭萱 | RO | 9 | 14 December 2012 | 16 May 2014 |
HUANG Shao Hsuan 黃劭萱 | RE | 9 | 03 October 2012 | 14 December 2012 |
JAO Meng Yu 饒孟友 | RO | 4 | 16 December 2011 | 30 June 2012 |
JAO Meng Yu 饒孟友 | RO | 9 | 16 December 2011 | 30 June 2012 |
LAI Tsao Lung 賴朝隆 | RO | 4 | 28 April 2014 | 13 August 2020 |
LAI Tsao Lung 賴朝隆 | RE | 9 | 14 January 2013 | 09 August 2013 |
LAI Tsao Lung 賴朝隆 | RO | 9 | 09 August 2013 | 13 August 2020 |
LAM Chi Hsin 林志興 | RE | 4 | 22 October 2019 | 17 April 2020 |
LAM Chi Hsin 林志興 | RE | 9 | 11 September 2018 | 17 April 2020 |
LAU Yik Ting 劉奕霆 | RE | 9 | 10 July 2017 | 05 October 2018 |
LAW Giggs 羅憲淳 | RE | 9 | 09 January 2012 | 05 July 2013 |
LEUNG Man Tat 梁文達 | RO | 4 | 07 February 2005 | 05 December 2005 |
LEUNG Man Tat 梁文達 | RO | 4 | 08 December 2003 | 09 May 2004 |
LI Chunyu 李春雨 | RE | 9 | 10 November 2022 | |
LI Kim Man 李劍文 | RO | 9 | 18 January 2022 | 12 October 2023 |
LI Kim Man 李劍文 | RO | 4 | 18 January 2022 | 12 October 2023 |
LI Kim Man 李劍文 | RE | 9 | 25 November 2021 | 18 January 2022 |
LI Kim Man 李劍文 | RE | 4 | 25 November 2021 | 18 January 2022 |
LIN Hao Wei 林豪威 | RO | 9 | 20 February 2012 | 01 May 2013 |
LIN Hao Wei 林豪威 | RO | 4 | 06 September 2012 | 01 May 2013 |
LIN Hao Wei 林豪威 | RE | 4 | 20 February 2012 | 06 September 2012 |
LIN Hao Wei 林豪威 | RE | 9 | 13 July 2011 | 20 February 2012 |
LIU Hsiang-Wen 劉湘雯 | RO | 4 | 01 April 2008 | 22 October 2008 |
LO Chi Kai Ivan 羅志佳 | RE | 9 | 16 September 2021 | 07 October 2022 |
LO Chi Kai Ivan 羅志佳 | RE | 4 | 16 September 2021 | 07 October 2022 |
MA Wenting 馬文婷 | RE | 4 | 08 September 2020 | 01 April 2021 |
MA Wenting 馬文婷 | RE | 9 | 08 September 2020 | 01 April 2021 |
MI Jia 米佳 | RO | 9 | 08 March 2011 | 01 March 2012 |
NGAN Ka Sing 顏嘉昇 | RO | 9 | 19 January 2021 | 31 August 2023 |
NGAN Ka Sing 顏嘉昇 | RO | 4 | 19 January 2021 | 31 August 2023 |
OU Hung Chieh 歐宏杰 | RE | 4 | 26 October 2011 | 31 March 2014 |
OU Hung Chieh 歐宏杰 | RE | 9 | 26 October 2011 | 31 March 2014 |
PUN Tit Shan 潘鐵珊 | RO | 9 | 28 March 2018 | 16 July 2020 |
PUN Tit Shan 潘鐵珊 | RO | 4 | 28 March 2018 | 16 July 2020 |
SHIH Yung-Ping 石永平 | RO | 9 | 21 June 2012 | 17 December 2012 |
SHIH Yung-Ping 石永平 | RE | 4 | 14 June 2012 | 21 June 2012 |
SHIH Yung-Ping 石永平 | RE | 9 | 14 June 2012 | 21 June 2012 |
SHIH Yung-Ping 石永平 | RO | 4 | 21 June 2012 | 17 December 2012 |
SO Kin 蘇健 | RO | 9 | 09 September 2020 | 31 October 2021 |
SO Kin 蘇健 | RO | 4 | 09 September 2020 | 31 October 2021 |
SO Kin 蘇健 | RE | 9 | 13 July 2020 | 09 September 2020 |
SO Kin 蘇健 | RE | 4 | 13 July 2020 | 09 September 2020 |
TAI Siu Hung 戴少雄 | RE | 4 | 05 May 2005 | 12 September 2005 |
TAN Chia Tien 譚家典 | RO | 9 | 08 March 2011 | 28 March 2012 |
TAN Chia Tien 譚家典 | RO | 4 | 28 August 2009 | 28 March 2012 |
TANG Kwan Chung 鄧君仲 | RE | 4 | 12 April 2005 | 05 July 2007 |
TANG Kwan Chung 鄧君仲 | RO | 4 | 23 June 2004 | 12 April 2005 |
TANG Kwan Chung 鄧君仲 | RE | 4 | 11 February 2004 | 23 June 2004 |
TSAI Yu-ching 蔡幼青 | RE | 9 | 29 July 2013 | 02 August 2013 |
TSOI Kap 蔡革 | RO | 4 | 09 January 2006 | 07 September 2007 |
TSUI Chi Man 徐志文 | RO | 4 | 21 November 2003 | 31 December 2018 |
TU Wen-chi 凃文棋 | RE | 4 | 27 February 2004 | 06 July 2004 |
WAN Tom 尹棠 | RO | 4 | 28 October 2003 | 28 February 2004 |
WANG Leping 王樂平 | RO | 4 | 07 October 2011 | 08 February 2012 |
WANG Leping 王樂平 | RO | 9 | 08 March 2011 | 08 February 2012 |
WEI Chung-Liang 韋忠良 | RO | 4 | 29 June 2012 | 20 April 2014 |
WONG Hok Kam 汪學金 | RO | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 22 August 2003 |
WONG Wai Ming, Jenny 黃慧明 | RE | 9 | 26 August 2016 | 13 March 2017 |
WONG Wai Ming, Jenny 黃慧明 | RE | 4 | 26 August 2016 | 13 March 2017 |
WONG Wing On 王永安 | RE | 4 | 02 June 2015 | 18 December 2015 |
WONG Wing On 王永安 | RE | 9 | 27 April 2015 | 18 December 2015 |
WU Teh Sen, Raymond 吳德生 | RE | 9 | 29 August 2011 | 31 December 2012 |
WU Tzu Kuan 吳姿觀 | RO | 9 | 13 August 2015 | 31 January 2017 |
WU Tzu Kuan 吳姿觀 | RO | 4 | 13 August 2015 | 31 January 2017 |
WU Tzu Kuan 吳姿觀 | RE | 4 | 20 February 2012 | 13 August 2015 |
WU Tzu Kuan 吳姿觀 | RE | 9 | 25 March 2013 | 13 August 2015 |
XING Li 邢莉 | RO | 9 | 17 August 2023 | 31 January 2024 |
XING Li 邢莉 | RO | 4 | 17 August 2023 | 31 January 2024 |
XIONG Hao 熊浩 | RO | 9 | 20 October 2020 | 12 March 2021 |
XIONG Hao 熊浩 | RO | 4 | 20 October 2020 | 12 March 2021 |
XIONG Hao 熊浩 | RE | 9 | 20 October 2020 | 20 October 2020 |
XIONG Hao 熊浩 | RE | 4 | 20 October 2020 | 20 October 2020 |
XU Shunfei 徐顺斐 | RE | 9 | 22 February 2024 | |
XU Shunfei 徐顺斐 | RE | 4 | 22 February 2024 | |
YEUNG Tsz Kin 楊子健 | RE | 9 | 15 January 2024 |