SFC Licences of LEE Cheuk Kwan, Vulcan 李焯鈞
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Akron Corporate Finance Limited 亞貝隆資本有限公司 | RO | 6 | 21 July 2022 | 30 December 2022 |
Akron Corporate Finance Limited 亞貝隆資本有限公司 | RE | 6 | 06 May 2022 | 21 July 2022 |
VS Capital Limited 勝利資本有限公司 | RO | 6 | 07 August 2020 | 17 November 2021 |
VS Capital Limited 勝利資本有限公司 | RE | 6 | 22 June 2020 | 07 August 2020 |
Elstone Capital Limited 千里碩融資有限公司 | RO | 6 | 22 May 2019 | 16 April 2020 |
Elstone Capital Limited 千里碩融資有限公司 | RE | 6 | 02 November 2018 | 22 May 2019 |
KGI Capital Asia Limited 凱基金融亞洲有限公司 | RE | 6 | 18 August 2017 | 02 October 2018 |
Quam Capital Limited 華富建業企業融資有限公司 | RE | 6 | 11 March 2014 | 06 August 2017 |
Optima Capital Limited 創越融資有限公司 | RE | 6 | 02 October 2009 | 08 March 2014 |
Optima Capital Limited 創越融資有限公司 | RE | 1 | 02 October 2009 | 08 March 2014 |