SFC Licences of YANG Zhangning 楊章宁
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Harvest Global Investments Limited 嘉實國際資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 11 September 2015 | |
Harvest Global Investments Limited 嘉實國際資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 11 September 2015 | |
Macquarie Capital Limited 麥格理資本股份有限公司 | RE | 4 | 23 June 2014 | 05 August 2015 |
Haitong International Research Limited 海通國際研究有限公司 | RE | 4 | 14 March 2012 | 31 May 2014 |