SFC Licences of XIE Hongyun 解紅云
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Greenland (Asia) Securities Co., Limited 綠地(亞洲)證券有限公司 | RE | 9 | 02 June 2020 | 31 August 2022 |
Greenland (Asia) Securities Co., Limited 綠地(亞洲)證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 02 June 2020 | 31 August 2022 |
Kaiser Capital Management Limited 嘉信資本管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 11 June 2019 | 30 April 2020 |
Kaiser Capital Management Limited 嘉信資本管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 11 June 2019 | 30 April 2020 |
Kaiser KT Capital Limited 嘉信開泰融資有限公司 | RO | 6 | 27 September 2018 | 30 April 2020 |
Kaiser KT Capital Limited 嘉信開泰融資有限公司 | RE | 6 | 26 January 2016 | 27 September 2018 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 4 | 23 September 2013 | 30 May 2014 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 1 | 05 November 2012 | 30 May 2014 |