SFC Licences of LI Wen 李文
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Raffles Assets Management (HK) Co. Limited 萬方資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 02 February 2024 | |
Raffles Assets Management (HK) Co. Limited 萬方資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 02 February 2024 | |
Raffles Assets Management (HK) Co. Limited 萬方資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 02 February 2024 | |
Founder Asset Management (Hong Kong) Limited 方正資產管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 07 July 2016 | 15 December 2017 |
Founder Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 方正證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 29 February 2016 | 15 December 2017 |
BTG Pactual Asia Limited 佰達濟有限公司 | RE | 9 | 08 May 2015 | 31 December 2015 |