SFC Licences of CHIU Chun Lung 趙駿龍
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
South China Investment Management Limited 南華投資管理有限公司 | RO | 9 | 22 November 2023 | |
South China Research Limited 南華資料研究有限公司 | RE | 4 | 28 February 2022 | |
South China Commodities Limited 南華期貨有限公司 | RO | 2 | 27 April 2021 | |
South China Securities Limited 南華證券投資有限公司 | RO | 1 | 28 January 2021 | |
South China Investment Management Limited 南華投資管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 24 July 2019 | 22 November 2023 |
South China Commodities Limited 南華期貨有限公司 | RE | 2 | 07 November 2018 | 27 April 2021 |
South China Securities Limited 南華證券投資有限公司 | RE | 1 | 07 November 2018 | 28 January 2021 |
Bright Smart Futures & Commodities Company Limited 耀才期貨及商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 15 September 2016 | 11 May 2018 |
Bright Smart Securities International (H.K.) Limited 耀才證券國際(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 03 August 2016 | 11 May 2018 |