SFC Licences of CHAN Kin Yan 陳建因
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Impression Investment Limited 印象投資有限公司 | RE | 9 | 15 July 2021 | 03 June 2022 |
Sunny Fortune Capital Limited 日進資本有限公司 | RE | 4 | 02 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 |
Sunny Fortune Capital Limited 日進資本有限公司 | RE | 6 | 22 May 2020 | 29 April 2021 |
Sunny Fortune Capital Limited 日進資本有限公司 | RE | 1 | 22 May 2020 | 29 April 2021 |
South China Securities Limited 南華證券投資有限公司 | RE | 1 | 14 November 2016 | 31 March 2020 |
South China Capital Limited 南華融資有限公司 | RE | 6 | 14 November 2016 | 31 March 2020 |
South China Research Limited 南華資料研究有限公司 | RE | 4 | 14 November 2016 | 06 March 2020 |