SFC Licences of XUE Qian 薛倩
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Founder Securities (Hong Kong) Capital Company Limited 方正證券(香港)融資有限公司 | RE | 6 | 12 October 2018 | 12 April 2019 |
Founder Securities (Hong Kong) Capital Company Limited 方正證券(香港)融資有限公司 | RE | 1 | 13 September 2018 | 12 April 2019 |
Founder Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 方正證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 13 September 2018 | 12 April 2019 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 4 | 28 November 2017 | 27 August 2018 |
Guosen Securities (HK) Brokerage Company, Limited 國信證券(香港)經紀有限公司 | RE | 1 | 28 November 2017 | 27 August 2018 |