SFC Licences of REN Tingting 任婷婷
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
YONXI International Finance Holdings Limited 雍熙國際金融控股有限公司 | RE | 9 | 27 August 2021 | 07 March 2022 |
YONXI Securities Limited 雍熙證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 30 July 2021 | 26 July 2022 |
YONXI Securities Limited 雍熙證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 30 July 2021 | 26 July 2022 |
Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 國泰君安證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 27 March 2020 | 03 July 2021 |
Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 國泰君安證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 27 March 2020 | 03 July 2021 |