SFC Licenceholders of YONXI Securities Limited 雍熙證券有限公司
- compliance@yonxi.com.hk
- Website
- https://www.yonxi.com.hk
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
AU-YEUNG Kam Kay 歐陽錦基 | RO | 4 | 27 January 2021 | 27 April 2022 |
AU-YEUNG Kam Kay 歐陽錦基 | RO | 1 | 27 January 2021 | 27 April 2022 |
CHEN Yuanfei 陳遠菲 | RE | 4 | 03 November 2021 | 20 January 2023 |
CHEN Yuanfei 陳遠菲 | RE | 1 | 03 November 2021 | 20 January 2023 |
CHEUNG Man Yu 張文裕 | RO | 4 | 28 April 2022 | 07 July 2022 |
CHEUNG Man Yu 張文裕 | RO | 1 | 28 April 2022 | 07 July 2022 |
CHEUNG Man Yu 張文裕 | RE | 4 | 17 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 |
CHEUNG Man Yu 張文裕 | RE | 1 | 17 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 |
KWAN Kin Kwok 關建國 | RO | 4 | 27 January 2022 | 31 August 2022 |
KWAN Kin Kwok 關建國 | RO | 1 | 27 January 2022 | 31 August 2022 |
LAM Chi Wai, Benny 林志偉 | RO | 4 | 13 June 2022 | 31 December 2022 |
LAM Chi Wai, Benny 林志偉 | RO | 1 | 13 June 2022 | 31 December 2022 |
LAM Chun Yan 林春欣 | RE | 4 | 27 May 2021 | 13 March 2022 |
LAM Chun Yan 林春欣 | RE | 1 | 27 May 2021 | 13 March 2022 |
LO Chun Yee 勞俊義 | RE | 4 | 11 June 2021 | 18 February 2022 |
LO Chun Yee 勞俊義 | RE | 1 | 11 June 2021 | 18 February 2022 |
REN Tingting 任婷婷 | RE | 4 | 30 July 2021 | 26 July 2022 |
REN Tingting 任婷婷 | RE | 1 | 30 July 2021 | 26 July 2022 |
TANG Ping Sum 鄧炳森 | RO | 4 | 07 December 2021 | 08 March 2022 |
TANG Ping Sum 鄧炳森 | RE | 1 | 07 December 2021 | 08 March 2022 |
TONG Hin Jo 湯顯祖 | RO | 4 | 27 January 2021 | 31 January 2022 |
TONG Hin Jo 湯顯祖 | RO | 1 | 27 January 2021 | 31 January 2022 |
XIAO Zhuopu 肖琢璞 | RE | 1 | 30 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 |