SFC Licenceholders of Regan International Securities Limited 雷根國際證券有限公司
- securities@regan.com.hk
- Website
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHU Chun Hin, Steven 朱振軒 | RO | 1 | 16 April 2019 | 03 November 2022 |
CHU Chun Hin, Steven 朱振軒 | RE | 1 | 03 April 2019 | 16 April 2019 |
FU Ming 傅鳴 | RO | 1 | 21 January 2019 | 10 March 2023 |
FU Ming 傅鳴 | RE | 1 | 11 January 2019 | 21 January 2019 |
LAM Chun Yuk 林俊旭 | RO | 1 | 23 July 2019 | 04 January 2021 |
LAM Chun Yuk 林俊旭 | RE | 1 | 04 June 2019 | 23 July 2019 |
PAK Chi Wing 白志頴 | RO | 1 | 21 September 2018 | 14 January 2019 |
TSANG Ming Fung 曾銘楓 | RO | 1 | 21 September 2018 | 14 March 2019 |
WONG King Man 黃景民 | RO | 1 | 28 October 2022 | 10 March 2023 |