SFC Licenceholders of GLY CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LIMITED 吉安資本管理有限公司
- info@glycm.com
- Website
- www.glycm.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHAN Toi Kin 陳代堅 | RE | 9 | 14 June 2019 | 23 November 2020 |
CHAN Toi Kin 陳代堅 | RE | 4 | 14 June 2019 | 23 November 2020 |
CHAN Toi Kin 陳代堅 | RE | 1 | 14 June 2019 | 23 November 2020 |
CHOI Yong | RO | 9 | 08 February 2019 | 11 April 2019 |
CHOI Yong | RO | 4 | 08 February 2019 | 11 April 2019 |
CHOI Yong | RO | 1 | 08 February 2019 | 11 April 2019 |
CHOU Jaime Yun Cheng 周運成 | RO | 9 | 24 March 2020 | |
CHOU Jaime Yun Cheng 周運成 | RO | 4 | 24 March 2020 | |
CHOU Jaime Yun Cheng 周運成 | RO | 1 | 24 March 2020 | |
CHOU Jaime Yun Cheng 周運成 | RE | 9 | 26 February 2020 | 24 March 2020 |
CHOU Jaime Yun Cheng 周運成 | RE | 4 | 26 February 2020 | 24 March 2020 |
GASCHE Joel Simon 郭祖龍 | RE | 4 | 28 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 |
GASCHE Joel Simon 郭祖龍 | RE | 1 | 28 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 |
HAMNAA Philip Axel Peter | RE | 9 | 24 July 2019 | 21 October 2019 |
HAMNAA Philip Axel Peter | RE | 4 | 24 July 2019 | 21 October 2019 |
HAMNAA Philip Axel Peter | RE | 1 | 24 July 2019 | 21 October 2019 |
KRKALO Hrvoje | RO | 9 | 08 February 2019 | |
KRKALO Hrvoje | RO | 4 | 08 February 2019 | |
KRKALO Hrvoje | RO | 1 | 08 February 2019 | |
LAI Shengnan 賴盛楠 | RE | 9 | 24 July 2019 | 27 March 2020 |
LAI Shengnan 賴盛楠 | RE | 4 | 24 July 2019 | 27 March 2020 |
LAI Shengnan 賴盛楠 | RE | 1 | 24 July 2019 | 27 March 2020 |
LEE Chun Ki 李雋祺 | RE | 9 | 15 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 |
LEE Chun Ki 李雋祺 | RE | 4 | 15 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 |
LEE Chun Ki 李雋祺 | RE | 1 | 15 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 |
LIN Ni 林昵 | RO | 9 | 08 February 2019 | |
LIN Ni 林昵 | RO | 4 | 08 February 2019 | |
LIN Ni 林昵 | RO | 1 | 08 February 2019 | |
WANG Shaohui 王劭輝 | RE | 9 | 20 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 |
WANG Shaohui 王劭輝 | RE | 4 | 20 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 |
WANG Shaohui 王劭輝 | RE | 1 | 20 April 2022 | 14 February 2023 |
WONG Ka Shun 王嘉順 | RE | 1 | 12 July 2021 | 18 August 2023 |
WONG Ka Shun 王嘉順 | RE | 9 | 12 July 2021 | 18 August 2023 |
WONG Ka Shun 王嘉順 | RE | 4 | 12 July 2021 | 18 August 2023 |
YAN Chen 颜晨 | RE | 4 | 20 July 2020 | 30 June 2021 |
YAN Chen 颜晨 | RE | 1 | 20 July 2020 | 30 June 2021 |
YAN Chen 颜晨 | RE | 9 | 14 July 2020 | 30 June 2021 |
ZHANG Zhi-Nan Rebecca 張之南 | RE | 9 | 20 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 |
ZHANG Zhi-Nan Rebecca 張之南 | RE | 4 | 20 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 |
ZHANG Zhi-Nan Rebecca 張之南 | RE | 1 | 20 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 |