SFC Licences of TSUI Wan Li 徐韵妮
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
South China Research Limited 南華資料研究有限公司 | RE | 4 | 24 November 2017 | 11 December 2017 |
South China Securities Limited 南華證券投資有限公司 | RE | 1 | 24 November 2017 | 11 December 2017 |
South China Investment Management Limited 南華投資管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 02 May 2017 | 11 December 2017 |
South China Capital Limited 南華融資有限公司 | RE | 6 | 14 April 2015 | 24 September 2015 |