SFC Licenceholders of EQT Partners Asia Limited
- agnes.tanfreer@eqtpartners.com
- Website
- www.eqtpartners.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
ATTING Lars Erik Fredrik | RE | 4 | 15 March 2021 | 01 March 2023 |
ATTING Lars Erik Fredrik | RE | 1 | 15 March 2021 | 01 March 2023 |
ATTING Lars Erik Fredrik | RO | 1 | 15 April 2011 | 31 July 2013 |
ATTING Lars Erik Fredrik | RO | 4 | 29 July 2008 | 31 July 2013 |
BYGGE Claes Johan | RO | 1 | 08 December 2016 | 31 July 2019 |
CHA Young Jun | RE | 4 | 31 January 2022 | 28 July 2022 |
CHA Young Jun | RE | 1 | 31 January 2022 | 28 July 2022 |
CHAE Jong-Yoon 蔡鍾允 | RE | 4 | 20 April 2018 | 28 February 2023 |
CHAE Jong-Yoon 蔡鍾允 | RE | 1 | 09 April 2018 | 28 February 2023 |
CHAI Man Hung, Carina 蔡文紅 | RE | 1 | 20 June 2011 | 06 July 2012 |
CHAI Man Hung, Carina 蔡文紅 | RO | 4 | 05 September 2005 | 06 July 2012 |
CHAN Lai Sha, Liza 陳麗莎 | RO | 4 | 10 November 2004 | 12 April 2005 |
CHAN Lai Sha, Liza 陳麗莎 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 10 November 2004 |
CHANG Koon Chung, Joseph 張冠中 | RE | 4 | 14 July 2008 | 28 November 2008 |
CHEN David 鄭世耀 | RE | 1 | 20 June 2011 | 30 June 2012 |
CHEN David 鄭世耀 | RE | 4 | 10 June 2008 | 30 June 2012 |
CHEN Hui 陳慧 | RE | 4 | 04 February 2020 | 01 March 2023 |
CHEN Hui 陳慧 | RE | 1 | 29 January 2020 | 01 March 2023 |
CHENG Ho Beng 鄭河明 | RO | 4 | 20 April 2005 | 01 May 2006 |
CHENG Ho Beng 鄭河明 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 20 April 2005 |
CHENG Jose Hosea Hor Yin 鄭可玄 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 03 December 2003 |
CHUNG Tak Wai 鍾德偉 | RO | 4 | 27 September 2012 | 31 January 2021 |
CHUNG Tak Wai 鍾德偉 | RE | 1 | 20 June 2011 | 31 January 2021 |
CHUNG Tak Wai 鍾德偉 | RE | 4 | 12 February 2009 | 27 September 2012 |
CHUNG Yue Ching 鍾宇晴 | RE | 4 | 26 March 2012 | 27 April 2018 |
CHUNG Yue Ching 鍾宇晴 | RE | 1 | 26 March 2012 | 27 April 2018 |
DITLEVSEN Mads Munkholt | RE | 4 | 16 June 2008 | 31 August 2009 |
FOK Kin Wah, Winnie 霍建華 | RO | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 17 March 2010 |
FUNK Florian Philipp | RE | 1 | 20 June 2011 | 30 June 2013 |
FUNK Florian Philipp | RE | 4 | 03 March 2011 | 30 June 2013 |
GORNY Wolfgang Georg | RO | 1 | 15 April 2011 | 30 June 2021 |
GORNY Wolfgang Georg | RE | 4 | 22 October 2010 | 30 June 2021 |
GRIFFITHS Simon David | RE | 1 | 20 June 2011 | 10 January 2014 |
GRIFFITHS Simon David | RE | 4 | 06 July 2010 | 10 January 2014 |
GRIFFITHS Simon David | RO | 4 | 26 March 2010 | 06 July 2010 |
GU Huaming 顧華明 | RE | 4 | 26 October 2005 | 01 August 2007 |
HAM Sehoon 咸世勳 | RO | 4 | 18 June 2021 | 28 February 2023 |
HAM Sehoon 咸世勳 | RO | 1 | 24 July 2018 | 28 February 2023 |
HAM Sehoon 咸世勳 | RE | 4 | 24 February 2016 | 18 June 2021 |
HAM Sehoon 咸世勳 | RE | 1 | 24 February 2016 | 24 July 2018 |
HAN Christopher David | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 06 January 2005 |
HAN Zhuorui 韩卓芮 | RE | 1 | 11 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 |
HAN Zhuorui 韩卓芮 | RE | 4 | 11 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 |
HO Gerran Chun Yin 何俊彥 | RO | 1 | 05 March 2021 | 30 June 2021 |
HO Gerran Chun Yin 何俊彥 | RO | 4 | 23 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 |
HO Gerran Chun Yin 何俊彥 | RE | 1 | 20 June 2011 | 05 March 2021 |
HO Gerran Chun Yin 何俊彥 | RE | 4 | 05 August 2010 | 23 December 2020 |
JI Zhen | RE | 4 | 15 August 2007 | 30 September 2008 |
KONG Pui Ying, Angel 江佩瑩 | RO | 4 | 07 September 2015 | 30 June 2019 |
KONG Pui Ying, Angel 江佩瑩 | RE | 1 | 20 June 2011 | 30 June 2019 |
KONG Pui Ying, Angel 江佩瑩 | RE | 4 | 04 September 2009 | 07 September 2015 |
LAM Chun Ho 林俊浩 | RE | 4 | 12 October 2016 | 28 February 2018 |
LAM Chun Ho 林俊浩 | RE | 1 | 12 October 2016 | 28 February 2018 |
LAU Allen Yin Sun 劉彥燊 | RE | 4 | 28 June 2004 | 26 September 2005 |
LAU Pak Kwan 劉百鈞 | RE | 1 | 20 June 2011 | 05 February 2013 |
LAU Pak Kwan 劉百鈞 | RE | 4 | 23 June 2008 | 05 February 2013 |
LEE Chin Yiu 李戩堯 | RO | 4 | 12 November 2021 | 01 March 2023 |
LEE Chin Yiu 李戩堯 | RE | 1 | 28 October 2015 | 01 March 2023 |
LEE Chin Yiu 李戩堯 | RE | 4 | 28 October 2015 | 12 November 2021 |
LEE Danny Lap 李立明 | RE | 4 | 05 May 2005 | 17 February 2006 |
LEE Soryo 李小麗 | RE | 4 | 17 December 2021 | 28 February 2023 |
LEE Soryo 李小麗 | RE | 1 | 17 December 2021 | 28 February 2023 |
LIANG Wei 梁偉 | RE | 4 | 16 November 2011 | 31 October 2013 |
LIANG Wei 梁偉 | RE | 1 | 16 November 2011 | 31 October 2013 |
LIANG Wei 梁偉 | RE | 1 | 20 June 2011 | 02 September 2011 |
LIANG Wei 梁偉 | RE | 4 | 21 January 2011 | 02 September 2011 |
LIU Ka Ki 廖嘉琪 | RE | 1 | 20 June 2011 | 16 May 2016 |
LIU Ka Ki 廖嘉琪 | RE | 4 | 28 January 2011 | 16 May 2016 |
LU An 盧海安 | RE | 4 | 28 March 2007 | 30 September 2008 |
MOK Kwan Ting Martin 莫昆庭 | RO | 1 | 25 October 2012 | 31 December 2020 |
MOK Kwan Ting Martin 莫昆庭 | RO | 4 | 23 November 2009 | 31 December 2020 |
MOK Kwan Ting Martin 莫昆庭 | RE | 4 | 12 February 2004 | 23 November 2009 |
NG Gerald Chi Fei 黃繼輝 | RE | 4 | 20 April 2015 | 04 December 2017 |
NG Gerald Chi Fei 黃繼輝 | RE | 1 | 20 April 2015 | 04 December 2017 |
NI Fei 倪霏 | RE | 4 | 21 January 2009 | 11 June 2010 |
ONO Takaaki | RE | 4 | 23 April 2019 | 01 September 2022 |
ONO Takaaki | RE | 1 | 23 April 2019 | 01 September 2022 |
PARK Sang | RE | 4 | 31 March 2005 | 23 May 2005 |
TAN Tian 譚天 | RE | 4 | 16 October 2018 | 02 May 2022 |
TAN Tian 譚天 | RE | 1 | 16 October 2018 | 02 May 2022 |
TONG Ching Lam, Brian 湯正楠 | RE | 4 | 09 January 2018 | 30 September 2021 |
TONG Ching Lam, Brian 湯正楠 | RE | 1 | 09 January 2018 | 30 September 2021 |
VON KOCH Nils Thomas | RO | 4 | 11 December 2019 | 01 March 2023 |
VON KOCH Nils Thomas | RO | 1 | 11 December 2019 | 01 March 2023 |
WANG Chengxiang 王呈祥 | RE | 4 | 04 May 2010 | 04 October 2010 |
ZHANG Honghao 張泓昊 | RE | 1 | 24 November 2014 | 30 September 2016 |
ZHANG Honghao 張泓昊 | RE | 4 | 24 November 2014 | 30 September 2016 |
ZHAO Yan 趙彥 | RE | 4 | 13 March 2008 | 02 September 2008 |
ZOU Jin | RE | 4 | 19 February 2016 | 28 February 2023 |
ZOU Jin | RE | 1 | 19 February 2016 | 28 February 2023 |