SFC Licenceholders of Pacific Eagle Asset Management Limited 翔鷹資產管理有限公司
- peam_bb@peagle.com.hk
- Website
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
AU YEUNG Chi Keung 歐陽智強 | RE | 9 | 14 October 2016 | 17 August 2017 |
AU YEUNG Chi Keung 歐陽智強 | RE | 4 | 14 October 2016 | 17 August 2017 |
CHAN Chi Chow 陳致洲 | RE | 9 | 15 July 2010 | 31 December 2010 |
CHAN Chi Chow 陳致洲 | RE | 4 | 15 July 2010 | 31 December 2010 |
CHAN Kong 陳崗 | RO | 4 | 07 October 2013 | |
CHAN Kong 陳崗 | RE | 4 | 22 May 2008 | 07 October 2013 |
CHAN Kong 陳崗 | RO | 9 | 07 April 2004 | |
CHEN Lin 陳琳 | RE | 9 | 10 February 2020 | 29 April 2022 |
CHEN Lin 陳琳 | RE | 4 | 10 February 2020 | 29 April 2022 |
HO Shui Fai, Ricky 何瑞輝 | RO | 9 | 29 August 2018 | 03 September 2018 |
HO Shui Fai, Ricky 何瑞輝 | RO | 4 | 29 August 2018 | 03 September 2018 |
HO Shui Fai, Ricky 何瑞輝 | RE | 9 | 06 July 2018 | 29 August 2018 |
HO Shui Fai, Ricky 何瑞輝 | RE | 4 | 06 July 2018 | 29 August 2018 |
HOU Xiaoyang 侯曉陽 | RE | 4 | 05 June 2008 | 04 June 2019 |
HOU Xiaoyang 侯曉陽 | RE | 9 | 20 May 2006 | 04 June 2019 |
KAM Fred 甘任符 | RE | 9 | 01 November 2017 | 26 April 2021 |
KAM Fred 甘任符 | RE | 4 | 01 November 2017 | 26 April 2021 |
LEUNG Wing Yin, Patricia 梁穎賢 | RE | 9 | 24 April 2008 | 28 February 2011 |
LEUNG Wing Yin, Patricia 梁穎賢 | RE | 4 | 24 April 2008 | 28 February 2011 |
MAK Ho Kwun, Eric 麥豪冠 | RE | 9 | 03 September 2013 | 04 May 2015 |
MAK Ho Kwun, Eric 麥豪冠 | RE | 4 | 03 September 2013 | 04 May 2015 |
MEI Anthony Hsiao Tung 梅曉東 | RO | 9 | 07 April 2004 | 19 July 2005 |
NG Wang To 吳宏圖 | RO | 9 | 16 December 2010 | 01 October 2013 |
NG Wang To 吳宏圖 | RO | 4 | 16 December 2010 | 01 October 2013 |
NG Wang To 吳宏圖 | RE | 4 | 05 June 2008 | 16 December 2010 |
NG Wang To 吳宏圖 | RE | 9 | 28 July 2006 | 16 December 2010 |
OHI Kanji | RE | 4 | 30 June 2014 | 26 April 2015 |
OHI Kanji | RE | 9 | 30 June 2014 | 26 April 2015 |
ONG Wey Ter, Kelvin | RO | 9 | 04 January 2017 | |
ONG Wey Ter, Kelvin | RO | 4 | 04 January 2017 | |
ONG Wey Ter, Kelvin | RE | 9 | 31 March 2015 | 04 January 2017 |
ONG Wey Ter, Kelvin | RE | 4 | 31 March 2015 | 04 January 2017 |
PATEL Bimalkant | RO | 9 | 23 January 2014 | 07 July 2016 |
PATEL Bimalkant | RO | 4 | 23 January 2014 | 07 July 2016 |
PATEL Bimalkant | RE | 9 | 25 February 2013 | 23 January 2014 |
PATEL Bimalkant | RE | 4 | 25 February 2013 | 23 January 2014 |
SETO John Gin Chung 司徒振中 | RO | 4 | 05 July 2007 | 01 January 2020 |
SETO John Gin Chung 司徒振中 | RO | 9 | 03 May 2006 | 01 January 2020 |
SONG Haiming 宋海銘 | RE | 9 | 21 May 2018 | 18 April 2019 |
SONG Haiming 宋海銘 | RE | 4 | 21 May 2018 | 18 April 2019 |
SOON Kian Lee 孫見理 | RO | 9 | 16 November 2023 | |
SOON Kian Lee 孫見理 | RO | 4 | 16 November 2023 | |
SOON Kian Lee 孫見理 | RE | 9 | 25 September 2023 | 16 November 2023 |
SOON Kian Lee 孫見理 | RE | 4 | 25 September 2023 | 16 November 2023 |
TAM Chung Ying, Ernie 譚仲英 | RO | 4 | 25 August 2014 | 02 October 2020 |
TAM Chung Ying, Ernie 譚仲英 | RO | 9 | 16 December 2010 | 02 October 2020 |
TAM Chung Ying, Ernie 譚仲英 | RO | 4 | 16 December 2010 | 16 June 2011 |
TAM Chung Ying, Ernie 譚仲英 | RE | 9 | 13 May 2008 | 16 December 2010 |
TAM Chung Ying, Ernie 譚仲英 | RE | 4 | 13 May 2008 | 16 December 2010 |
TEY Wei Lin 鄭偉霖 | RO | 9 | 06 December 2005 | |
TONG King Hang 湯景恆 | RO | 9 | 05 July 2007 | 21 March 2013 |
TONG King Hang 湯景恆 | RO | 4 | 05 July 2007 | 21 March 2013 |
TONG King Hang 湯景恆 | RE | 9 | 02 March 2006 | 05 July 2007 |
TSANG Yuen Ting 曾宛婷 | RE | 9 | 11 March 2011 | 30 June 2013 |
TSANG Yuen Ting 曾宛婷 | RE | 4 | 11 March 2011 | 30 June 2013 |
WONG Chun Tung, Anthony 黃俊東 | RE | 9 | 05 January 2015 | 03 August 2016 |
WONG Chun Tung, Anthony 黃俊東 | RE | 4 | 05 January 2015 | 03 August 2016 |
WONG Chung Keung 王仲強 | RE | 9 | 04 February 2020 | 01 June 2024 |
WONG Chung Keung 王仲強 | RE | 4 | 04 February 2020 | 01 June 2024 |
WU Hongqi 吳宏奇 | RE | 9 | 16 June 2014 | 05 August 2015 |
WU Hongqi 吳宏奇 | RE | 4 | 16 June 2014 | 05 August 2015 |
YAU Wing Sze 邱詠詩 | RE | 4 | 02 April 2015 | 01 June 2024 |
YAU Wing Sze 邱詠詩 | RE | 9 | 02 April 2015 | 01 June 2024 |
YIP Tai Yuen 葉泰源 | RO | 4 | 05 July 2007 | 24 November 2012 |
YIP Tai Yuen 葉泰源 | RO | 9 | 20 October 2006 | 24 November 2012 |
YIP Tai Yuen 葉泰源 | RE | 9 | 04 April 2006 | 20 October 2006 |