SFC Licences of CHAN Janice Wing Yee 陳穎怡
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
MaiCapital Limited | RO | 9 | 15 October 2019 | 25 January 2021 |
MaiCapital Limited | RO | 4 | 09 May 2019 | 25 January 2021 |
MaiCapital Limited | RE | 9 | 18 September 2018 | 15 October 2019 |
MaiCapital Limited | RE | 4 | 18 September 2018 | 09 May 2019 |
South China Capital Limited 南華融資有限公司 | RE | 6 | 01 February 2016 | 28 February 2018 |
South China Research Limited 南華資料研究有限公司 | RE | 4 | 01 February 2016 | 28 February 2018 |
South China Securities Limited 南華證券投資有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 February 2016 | 28 February 2018 |
Rothschild & Co Hong Kong Limited 羅斯柴爾德恩可香港有限公司 | RE | 6 | 16 August 2010 | 27 March 2014 |
Rothschild & Co Hong Kong Limited 羅斯柴爾德恩可香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 16 August 2010 | 27 March 2014 |
Rothschild & Co Hong Kong Limited 羅斯柴爾德恩可香港有限公司 | RE | 1 | 16 August 2010 | 27 March 2014 |
CITIC Securities Corporate Finance (HK) Limited 中信証券融資(香港)有限公司 | RE | 6 | 16 October 2007 | 08 August 2010 |
CITIC Securities Corporate Finance (HK) Limited 中信証券融資(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 16 October 2007 | 08 August 2010 |
CITIC Securities Corporate Finance (HK) Limited 中信証券融資(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 16 October 2007 | 08 August 2010 |