SFC Licenceholders of Neo Risk Investment Advisors Limited
- haroldkim@neoriskinvestment.com
- Website
- www.neoriskinvestment.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
BAEK June Seok 白埈錫 | RE | 9 | 21 April 2015 | 28 April 2018 |
BAEK June Seok 白埈錫 | RE | 4 | 21 April 2015 | 28 April 2018 |
CHEN Zhao Teng 陳騰昭 | RO | 9 | 05 February 2015 | 31 March 2020 |
CHEN Zhao Teng 陳騰昭 | RO | 4 | 05 February 2015 | 31 March 2020 |
COLLARD Jeremy David | RO | 9 | 13 July 2015 | 03 October 2016 |
COLLARD Jeremy David | RO | 4 | 13 July 2015 | 03 October 2016 |
COLLARD Jeremy David | RE | 9 | 03 June 2015 | 13 July 2015 |
COLLARD Jeremy David | RE | 4 | 03 June 2015 | 13 July 2015 |
KIM Ho Young | RO | 9 | 05 February 2015 | |
KIM Ho Young | RO | 4 | 05 February 2015 | |
KONG Teck Chien 江德銓 | RE | 9 | 28 November 2023 | |
KONG Teck Chien 江德銓 | RE | 4 | 28 November 2023 | |
KUAN Roy | RO | 9 | 06 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 |
KUAN Roy | RO | 4 | 06 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 |
KUAN Roy | RE | 9 | 22 July 2020 | 06 August 2020 |
KUAN Roy | RE | 4 | 24 June 2020 | 06 August 2020 |
LOH Yeong Shang | RO | 9 | 25 March 2020 | |
LOH Yeong Shang | RO | 4 | 25 March 2020 | |
LOH Yeong Shang | RE | 9 | 12 November 2018 | 25 March 2020 |
LOH Yeong Shang | RE | 4 | 10 August 2018 | 25 March 2020 |
PANG Kar Ho Albert | RE | 9 | 24 February 2020 | 30 September 2020 |
PANG Kar Ho Albert | RE | 4 | 24 February 2020 | 30 September 2020 |
PENG Shih-Wei | RE | 9 | 21 August 2017 | 07 August 2018 |
PENG Shih-Wei | RE | 4 | 21 August 2017 | 07 August 2018 |
PHANG Sui Yang 彭修阳 | RO | 9 | 09 May 2024 | 31 July 2024 |
PHANG Sui Yang 彭修阳 | RO | 4 | 09 May 2024 | 31 July 2024 |
PHANG Sui Yang 彭修阳 | RE | 9 | 25 April 2022 | 09 May 2024 |
PHANG Sui Yang 彭修阳 | RE | 4 | 25 April 2022 | 09 May 2024 |