SFC Licenceholders of VMI Securities Limited 創市証劵有限公司
- cs@venturemarkit.com
- Website
- www.vmisec.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHAN Hong Ching 陳康程 | RO | 1 | 04 September 2018 | 18 March 2022 |
CHAN Yan Yu Jessica 陳欣餘 | RE | 1 | 08 January 2021 | 08 February 2021 |
CHAN Yiu Man 陳耀文 | RE | 1 | 26 February 2021 | 10 January 2023 |
CHEN Kim Ching 陳錦清 | RO | 1 | 21 March 2022 | |
CHENG Lok Wai 鄭洛煒 | RO | 1 | 22 March 2023 | 22 September 2023 |
CHENG Lok Wai 鄭洛煒 | RE | 1 | 21 February 2023 | 22 March 2023 |
DAI Li 戴力 | RE | 1 | 11 January 2018 | 14 June 2018 |
DU Hequn 杜鶴群 | RO | 1 | 11 January 2017 | 31 March 2021 |
LAO Hong Fat 劉康發 | RE | 1 | 23 April 2021 | 03 May 2021 |
LEUNG Hiu Lam Kristie 梁曉琳 | RE | 1 | 18 September 2020 | 30 September 2021 |
LI Minyu 李旻昱 | RE | 1 | 09 August 2018 | 06 April 2020 |
LIN Hung Yuan 林宏遠 | RO | 1 | 24 October 2018 | 29 October 2019 |
TONG Hin Jo 湯顯祖 | RO | 1 | 11 January 2017 | 07 September 2018 |
TSO Wai Sum 曹偉深 | RO | 1 | 26 November 2019 | 10 January 2023 |
TSO Wai Sum 曹偉深 | RE | 1 | 11 October 2019 | 26 November 2019 |
WANG Jiayi 王佳懿 | RE | 1 | 05 September 2018 | 05 July 2021 |
WONG Pak Yui, Maffee 黃柏叡 | RO | 1 | 23 April 2024 | |
WONG Pak Yui, Maffee 黃柏叡 | RE | 1 | 16 April 2024 | 23 April 2024 |
YIN Yue 殷悅 | RO | 1 | 08 June 2017 | 16 August 2017 |
YIN Yue 殷悅 | RE | 1 | 06 April 2017 | 08 June 2017 |