SFC Licenceholders of JT Capital Asset Management Limited 凱庫資產管理有限公司
- info@jtcam.com.hk
- Website
- www.jtcam.com.hk
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHAN Sai Yee, Vincent 陳世義 | RE | 9 | 22 March 2023 | 15 May 2023 |
CHAN Sai Yee, Vincent 陳世義 | RE | 4 | 22 March 2023 | 15 May 2023 |
CHIU Ka Wah 招家驊 | RE | 9 | 29 October 2018 | |
FAN Yuen Yi 范婉儀 | RE | 1 | 04 April 2019 | 30 September 2020 |
FUNG Pui Kin 馮培健 | RE | 1 | 29 January 2019 | 16 December 2020 |
HUS Chia Ching 徐嘉慶 | RO | 9 | 20 February 2018 | 31 August 2022 |
HUS Chia Ching 徐嘉慶 | RO | 4 | 20 February 2018 | 31 August 2022 |
HUS Chia Ching 徐嘉慶 | RO | 1 | 20 February 2018 | 16 December 2020 |
HUS Chia Ching 徐嘉慶 | RE | 9 | 16 January 2018 | 20 February 2018 |
HUS Chia Ching 徐嘉慶 | RE | 4 | 16 January 2018 | 20 February 2018 |
HUS Chia Ching 徐嘉慶 | RE | 1 | 16 January 2018 | 20 February 2018 |
LEUNG Tat Kwong 梁達光 | RO | 9 | 19 May 2023 | |
LEUNG Tat Kwong 梁達光 | RO | 4 | 19 May 2023 | |
LU Jiayi 陸嘉憶 | RE | 9 | 25 October 2018 | 30 January 2021 |
MACALPIN Kenneth Allan Connolly | RE | 1 | 14 December 2018 | 05 February 2020 |
SEETO Siu Hong 司徒劭康 | RE | 9 | 22 November 2019 | 21 August 2020 |
SEETO Siu Hong 司徒劭康 | RE | 4 | 22 November 2019 | 21 August 2020 |
SEETO Siu Hong 司徒劭康 | RE | 1 | 22 November 2019 | 21 August 2020 |
SULTAN Asad Turab | RE | 1 | 30 January 2019 | 16 December 2020 |
TSANG Yim Fan, Josephine 曾艷芬 | RO | 1 | 14 December 2017 | 08 January 2021 |
TSANG Yim Fan, Josephine 曾艷芬 | RO | 9 | 14 December 2017 | |
TSANG Yim Fan, Josephine 曾艷芬 | RO | 4 | 14 December 2017 | |
YE MINGHUI 叶明輝 | RO | 9 | 14 December 2017 | 30 June 2021 |
YE MINGHUI 叶明輝 | RO | 4 | 14 December 2017 | 30 June 2021 |
YE MINGHUI 叶明輝 | RO | 1 | 14 December 2017 | 16 December 2020 |
YEUNG On Lit 楊安烈 | RE | 1 | 28 October 2020 | 16 December 2020 |
YEUNG On Lit 楊安烈 | RE | 9 | 28 October 2020 |