SFC Licenceholders of Gavekal Capital Limited
- marco@gavekal.com
- Website
- www.gavekal.com
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
ALFONSI Sebastien | RE | 9 | 27 April 2023 | 01 August 2024 |
ALFONSI Sebastien | RE | 9 | 15 May 2013 | 15 June 2022 |
CAMPBELL Adam Edward | RE | 9 | 11 April 2014 | 17 June 2016 |
CHAN Fat Tat 陳發達 | RE | 9 | 18 February 2014 | 20 February 2015 |
CHAN Ngai Kwong 陳顗光 | RE | 9 | 10 September 2021 | |
CHEUNG Wai Kan, Christine 張蔚瑾 | RE | 9 | 02 May 2013 | |
DARCET Didier, Jacques | RE | 9 | 18 August 2014 | 08 May 2023 |
DE MOLLERAT DU JEU Michael, Charles, Georges, Jacques, Marie | RE | 9 | 18 August 2014 | 08 May 2023 |
DENYER William Earl | RE | 9 | 21 September 2007 | 01 April 2008 |
DESSART Jenna Anne Frederique | RE | 9 | 02 March 2015 | 27 January 2017 |
EL-KHOURY Jean | RE | 9 | 20 November 2014 | 01 June 2016 |
FIELDS Daniel Mays | RE | 9 | 02 May 2013 | 01 January 2017 |
FIELDS Laura Michelle | RE | 9 | 16 November 2011 | 01 January 2017 |
GAVE Charles Jean Hubert | RE | 9 | 09 March 2004 | 09 February 2023 |
GAVE Charles Jean Hubert | RO | 9 | 09 June 2003 | 09 March 2004 |
GAVE Louis Vincent | RO | 9 | 09 June 2003 | |
HEUNG Chun Wai 香鎮偉 | RE | 9 | 03 May 2021 | 12 May 2023 |
HO Kai Shing, Alfred 何啟承 | RO | 9 | 01 March 2007 | |
HO Kai Shing, Alfred 何啟承 | RE | 9 | 23 November 2006 | 01 March 2007 |
HUBERT Marc William | RE | 9 | 27 October 2006 | 13 May 2010 |
HUI Wai Yi, Surina 許慧儀 | RE | 9 | 20 March 2008 | 31 December 2008 |
JACOBSON Dominic William | RE | 9 | 01 April 2016 | 31 March 2018 |
KIM Peter Sin | RE | 9 | 01 October 2006 | 30 June 2008 |
KOK Jiancong, Jonathan | RE | 9 | 22 August 2016 | 01 October 2022 |
LAI Sai Chung, Marco 黎世忠 | RE | 9 | 23 October 2006 | 15 June 2022 |
LAMOTTE Mattias Ivan | RO | 9 | 05 February 2004 | 15 August 2008 |
LAMOTTE Mattias Ivan | RE | 9 | 21 July 2003 | 05 February 2004 |
LEE Jeonghee | RE | 9 | 31 August 2010 | 10 June 2013 |
LEGLAND Arnaud Pierre Daniel | RE | 9 | 17 November 2017 | |
LIGHTBOUND Christopher William | RE | 9 | 10 December 2012 | 28 December 2015 |
LIGHTBOUND Christopher William | RE | 9 | 16 November 2011 | 30 July 2012 |
LIU Jian 劉見 | RE | 9 | 29 July 2021 | 01 October 2021 |
LOR Chung Hui | RE | 9 | 04 October 2021 | 28 June 2024 |
LUK Tsz Wai 陸子維 | RE | 9 | 08 March 2007 | |
LUO Xi 羅玺 | RE | 9 | 25 March 2008 | 13 May 2010 |
MA Gavin See-Yin 馬思賢 | RE | 9 | 11 June 2013 | 31 October 2019 |
MOK Ngo Wang, Owen 莫傲宏 | RE | 9 | 26 January 2022 | 31 January 2024 |
MONOT Cosme Hubert Roger Pierre | RE | 9 | 20 November 2014 | 20 September 2016 |
NG Yu Hei 吳宇熙 | RE | 9 | 17 December 2020 | |
POON Dick Lam 潘迪藍 | RE | 9 | 14 June 2018 | |
POON Dick Lam 潘迪藍 | RE | 9 | 13 January 2006 | 08 October 2013 |
SIMONS Warwick Dean | RE | 9 | 11 March 2011 | 07 February 2012 |
TOMLINSON James Blaine John | RE | 9 | 25 March 2008 | 01 July 2008 |
WONG Chi Ho, Eric 王志浩 | RE | 9 | 02 May 2013 | 31 October 2021 |
WOO Stephanie Ka Wai 胡家瑋 | RE | 9 | 02 May 2013 | 01 February 2014 |
WOO Stephanie Ka Wai 胡家瑋 | RE | 9 | 17 April 2008 | 25 October 2010 |
WOO Yee Ting, Patricia 胡苡婷 | RE | 9 | 04 September 2013 | 31 March 2015 |
WU Richard Chin-Shan 吳青山 | RE | 9 | 04 July 2006 | 15 August 2008 |
YAO Sheng 姚聖 | RE | 9 | 23 April 2008 | 05 June 2008 |
ZHAO Meng Ji 趙萌佶 | RE | 9 | 04 October 2016 |