SFC Licenceholders of Pamirs Capital (H.K.) Limited 高原証券有限公司
- compliance@pamirs.com.hk
- Website
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
AU-YOUNG Hin Lap 歐陽顯立 | RO | 6 | 10 January 2023 | 22 March 2024 |
AU-YOUNG Hin Lap 歐陽顯立 | RO | 1 | 10 January 2023 | 22 March 2024 |
AU-YOUNG Hin Lap 歐陽顯立 | RO | 9 | 24 March 2021 | 22 March 2024 |
AU-YOUNG Hin Lap 歐陽顯立 | RO | 4 | 24 March 2021 | 22 March 2024 |
CHEUNG Kam Fai, Alan 張錦輝 | RE | 9 | 27 September 2017 | 29 December 2017 |
CHOW Yiu Chung 周耀聰 | RO | 9 | 07 June 2024 | |
CHOW Yiu Chung 周耀聰 | RO | 4 | 07 June 2024 | |
HO Ying Chih 何英志 | RO | 1 | 18 October 2012 | 28 February 2018 |
HO Ying Chih 何英志 | RO | 9 | 10 September 2010 | 28 February 2018 |
HO Ying Chih 何英志 | RO | 4 | 10 September 2010 | 28 February 2018 |
HSU Edward Ming Yu 徐明宇 | RE | 9 | 29 September 2017 | 29 December 2017 |
HUI Pik Yung 許碧容 | RO | 1 | 05 June 2012 | 28 September 2017 |
HUI Pik Yung 許碧容 | RE | 9 | 30 March 2011 | 28 September 2017 |
HUI Pik Yung 許碧容 | RE | 4 | 30 March 2011 | 28 September 2017 |
HUI Sheung Yin, Daniel 許尚賢 | RO | 9 | 13 May 2020 | 15 June 2020 |
HUI Sheung Yin, Daniel 許尚賢 | RO | 4 | 13 May 2020 | 15 June 2020 |
HUI Sheung Yin, Daniel 許尚賢 | RE | 9 | 07 April 2020 | 13 May 2020 |
HUI Sheung Yin, Daniel 許尚賢 | RE | 4 | 07 April 2020 | 13 May 2020 |
KAO Yu Lin 高毓聆 | RE | 9 | 27 October 2017 | 30 July 2018 |
KAO Yu Lin 高毓聆 | RE | 4 | 27 October 2017 | 30 July 2018 |
KAO Yu Lin 高毓聆 | RE | 1 | 27 October 2017 | 30 July 2018 |
KIM Kenneth | RE | 9 | 17 November 2017 | 28 February 2019 |
LAI Tsung-Yu 賴宗裕 | RO | 1 | 19 September 2018 | 16 July 2019 |
LAI Tsung-Yu 賴宗裕 | RO | 4 | 02 February 2018 | 31 January 2020 |
LAI Tsung-Yu 賴宗裕 | RO | 9 | 02 February 2018 | 31 January 2020 |
LAI Tsung-Yu 賴宗裕 | RE | 1 | 14 December 2017 | 19 September 2018 |
LAI Tsung-Yu 賴宗裕 | RE | 9 | 14 December 2017 | 02 February 2018 |
LAI Tsung-Yu 賴宗裕 | RE | 4 | 14 December 2017 | 02 February 2018 |
LAU Ka Fung Adrian 劉家灃 | RE | 9 | 31 May 2017 | 09 December 2017 |
LAU Ka Fung Adrian 劉家灃 | RE | 1 | 31 May 2017 | 09 December 2017 |
LAU Ka Fung Adrian 劉家灃 | RE | 4 | 31 May 2017 | 09 December 2017 |
LEE Yang-Shen 李洋昇 | RO | 9 | 29 March 2018 | 15 March 2020 |
LEE Yang-Shen 李洋昇 | RO | 4 | 29 March 2018 | 15 March 2020 |
LIN I-Wen 林怡妏 | RO | 4 | 29 December 2017 | 10 November 2018 |
LIN I-Wen 林怡妏 | RO | 1 | 29 December 2017 | 10 November 2018 |
LO Man Hon Bryan 盧民翰 | RE | 1 | 20 March 2018 | 23 May 2018 |
MAK Ka Sing 麥嘉聲 | RO | 1 | 10 January 2023 | |
MAK Ka Sing 麥嘉聲 | RO | 9 | 08 September 2020 | |
MAK Ka Sing 麥嘉聲 | RO | 4 | 08 September 2020 | |
MAK Ka Sing 麥嘉聲 | RE | 9 | 25 August 2020 | 08 September 2020 |
MAK Ka Sing 麥嘉聲 | RE | 4 | 25 August 2020 | 08 September 2020 |
MIN Brett Jae | RE | 9 | 15 September 2017 | 01 June 2018 |
SHIAU Yann-Huei 蕭彥輝 | RO | 9 | 13 December 2019 | 31 December 2020 |
SHIAU Yann-Huei 蕭彥輝 | RO | 4 | 13 December 2019 | 31 December 2020 |
SHIAU Yann-Huei 蕭彥輝 | RE | 9 | 22 November 2019 | 13 December 2019 |
SHIAU Yann-Huei 蕭彥輝 | RE | 4 | 22 November 2019 | 13 December 2019 |
SUEI Feng-jih 隋風致 | RO | 1 | 05 June 2012 | 18 June 2019 |
SUEI Feng-jih 隋風致 | RO | 9 | 10 September 2010 | 18 June 2019 |
SUEI Feng-jih 隋風致 | RO | 4 | 10 September 2010 | 18 June 2019 |
TAN Taizhi 譚泰之 | RE | 1 | 08 May 2017 | 02 March 2018 |
TANG Lai Ping 鄧麗萍 | RE | 1 | 06 June 2018 | 21 September 2018 |
TSAI Robert Tu-Yun 蔡篤昀 | RE | 9 | 24 May 2013 | 29 December 2017 |
TSAI Robert Tu-Yun 蔡篤昀 | RE | 4 | 24 May 2013 | 29 December 2017 |
TSAI Robert Tu-Yun 蔡篤昀 | RE | 1 | 24 May 2013 | 29 December 2017 |
TSANG Chung Lam, Andrew 曾忠林 | RO | 6 | 21 August 2024 | |
TSANG Chung Lam, Andrew 曾忠林 | RO | 4 | 21 August 2024 | |
TSANG Chung Lam, Andrew 曾忠林 | RO | 1 | 21 August 2024 | |
WONG Siu Kin 黃紹乾 | RO | 6 | 10 January 2023 | |
YAM Wai Yuen Vincent 任維淵 | RE | 4 | 11 July 2017 | 29 December 2017 |
YAM Wai Yuen Vincent 任維淵 | RE | 9 | 11 July 2017 | 29 December 2017 |
ZHANG Yunyan 張云艷 | RE | 9 | 04 October 2018 | 20 November 2019 |
ZHEN Jingjing 甄晶晶 | RE | 1 | 02 October 2013 | 01 September 2017 |
ZHENG Qiaoshi 鄭喬詩 | RE | 1 | 25 October 2018 | 28 February 2019 |
ZHENG Qiaoshi 鄭喬詩 | RE | 9 | 25 October 2018 | 28 February 2019 |