SFC Licenceholders of China Rise Securities Asset Management Company Limited 華晉證券資產管理有限公司
- info@chinarisesec.com.hk
- Website
- www.chinarisesec.com.hk
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHAN Chi Fung 陳志烽 | RE | 9 | 20 November 2017 | 13 February 2019 |
CHAN Chi Fung 陳志烽 | RE | 1 | 20 July 2017 | 13 February 2019 |
CHAN Kam Fung Angus 陳錦鋒 | RE | 1 | 23 June 2020 | |
CHAN Kam Fung Angus 陳錦鋒 | RE | 4 | 23 June 2020 | |
CHAN Kam Fung Angus 陳錦鋒 | RE | 9 | 23 June 2020 | |
CHAN Man, Anna 陳敏 | RO | 1 | 18 February 2014 | 09 April 2014 |
CHAN Man, Anna 陳敏 | RE | 1 | 28 January 2014 | 18 February 2014 |
CHAN Pui Cheung 陳沛彰 | RE | 9 | 06 October 2015 | 16 November 2015 |
CHAN Pui Cheung 陳沛彰 | RE | 4 | 06 October 2015 | 16 November 2015 |
CHEUNG Fuk Shing Chris 張福成 | RE | 1 | 14 April 2010 | 01 December 2010 |
CHEUNG Lai Yan Charles 張禮仁 | RO | 1 | 14 July 2014 | 16 January 2016 |
CHEUNG Lai Yan Charles 張禮仁 | RO | 9 | 14 February 2014 | 16 January 2016 |
CHEUNG Lai Yan Charles 張禮仁 | RO | 4 | 14 February 2014 | 16 January 2016 |
CHIU Chun Yin Edward 趙臻彥 | RE | 1 | 26 March 2018 | 13 February 2019 |
CHUANG Johnny 莊頌恩 | RE | 9 | 02 June 2016 | 30 September 2018 |
CHUANG Johnny 莊頌恩 | RE | 4 | 02 June 2016 | 30 September 2018 |
CHUANG Johnny 莊頌恩 | RE | 1 | 02 June 2016 | 30 September 2018 |
CHUI Loong Chik, Nelson 徐隆稷 | RO | 9 | 10 September 2018 | 01 April 2019 |
CHUI Loong Chik, Nelson 徐隆稷 | RO | 4 | 10 September 2018 | 01 April 2019 |
CHUNG Yi Tung 鍾怡東 | RE | 1 | 21 November 2016 | 29 April 2017 |
FAN Chun Wah 范俊華 | RO | 1 | 09 August 2024 | |
FAN Chun Wah 范俊華 | RE | 1 | 05 July 2024 | 09 August 2024 |
FUNG Wai Kwong 馮煒洸 | RE | 1 | 07 June 2024 | |
FUNG Wai Kwong 馮煒洸 | RE | 4 | 18 August 2023 | |
FUNG Wai Kwong 馮煒洸 | RE | 9 | 24 August 2022 | |
FUNG Wang Yuen 馮宏遠 | RO | 9 | 05 September 2019 | |
FUNG Wang Yuen 馮宏遠 | RO | 4 | 05 September 2019 | |
FUNG Wang Yuen 馮宏遠 | RO | 1 | 05 September 2019 | |
HUNG Kam Yu 洪錦儒 | RE | 1 | 02 October 2013 | 30 January 2014 |
KIM Chung Wan 金清完 | RE | 9 | 16 February 2017 | 19 April 2018 |
KIM Chung Wan 金清完 | RE | 4 | 16 February 2017 | 19 April 2018 |
KIM Chung Wan 金清完 | RE | 1 | 16 February 2017 | 19 April 2018 |
KO Kin Ka 高健珈 | RE | 1 | 26 March 2018 | 29 January 2019 |
LAM Paul 林保羅 | RO | 9 | 02 February 2016 | 31 December 2018 |
LAM Paul 林保羅 | RO | 4 | 02 February 2016 | 31 December 2018 |
LAM Paul 林保羅 | RO | 1 | 02 February 2016 | 31 December 2018 |
LAM Shing 林誠 | RE | 1 | 27 April 2018 | 03 June 2019 |
LEUNG Tai Wai 梁大偉 | RE | 9 | 26 May 2016 | 08 October 2016 |
LEUNG Tai Wai 梁大偉 | RE | 4 | 26 May 2016 | 08 October 2016 |
LEUNG Tai Wai 梁大偉 | RO | 1 | 23 April 2015 | 08 October 2016 |
LEUNG Tai Wai 梁大偉 | RE | 1 | 23 November 2009 | 23 April 2015 |
LI Ho Lung 李灝龍 | RE | 9 | 19 February 2024 | |
LI Ho Lung 李灝龍 | RE | 4 | 19 February 2024 | |
LI Ho Lung 李灝龍 | RE | 4 | 05 June 2023 | 13 December 2023 |
LI Ho Lung 李灝龍 | RE | 9 | 05 June 2023 | 13 December 2023 |
LI Patrick 李栢祺 | RO | 9 | 12 January 2017 | 18 February 2020 |
LI Patrick 李栢祺 | RO | 4 | 12 January 2017 | 18 February 2020 |
LI Patrick 李栢祺 | RO | 1 | 12 January 2017 | 18 February 2020 |
LI Patrick 李栢祺 | RE | 9 | 17 November 2016 | 12 January 2017 |
LI Patrick 李栢祺 | RE | 4 | 17 November 2016 | 12 January 2017 |
LI Patrick 李栢祺 | RE | 1 | 17 November 2016 | 12 January 2017 |
LI Wai Lun 李偉倫 | RE | 9 | 07 December 2017 | 31 August 2020 |
LI Wai Lun 李偉倫 | RE | 4 | 13 July 2017 | 31 August 2020 |
LI Wai Lun 李偉倫 | RE | 1 | 13 July 2017 | 31 August 2020 |
LIU Kam Lung 廖金龍 | RE | 1 | 22 October 2009 | 25 March 2011 |
LUI Benji 呂軍衛 | RE | 1 | 04 August 2017 | 13 February 2019 |
LUI Benji 呂軍衛 | RE | 4 | 04 August 2017 | 13 February 2019 |
MA Pui Choi 馬培才 | RE | 1 | 23 February 2011 | 28 April 2017 |
OR Lee Sa 柯莉莎 | RE | 1 | 14 July 2014 | 12 January 2015 |
SHIU Kin Keung, Sammy 蕭健強 | RE | 9 | 14 October 2014 | 27 April 2015 |
SHIU Kin Keung, Sammy 蕭健強 | RO | 4 | 14 February 2014 | 27 April 2015 |
SHIU Kin Keung, Sammy 蕭健強 | RO | 9 | 14 February 2014 | 14 October 2014 |
SHIU Kin Keung, Sammy 蕭健強 | RO | 1 | 28 August 2009 | 27 April 2015 |
TO Koon Hung, Andrew 杜冠雄 | RO | 1 | 04 July 2014 | 31 January 2017 |
TO Koon Hung, Andrew 杜冠雄 | RO | 9 | 02 May 2014 | 31 January 2017 |
TO Koon Hung, Andrew 杜冠雄 | RO | 4 | 14 February 2014 | 31 January 2017 |
TO Koon Hung, Andrew 杜冠雄 | RE | 1 | 17 July 2013 | 04 July 2014 |
TSE Ming Fong 謝明晃 | RE | 4 | 05 June 2024 | |
TSE Ming Fong 謝明晃 | RE | 1 | 05 June 2024 | |
TSE Ming Fong 謝明晃 | RO | 4 | 23 April 2019 | 05 June 2024 |
TSE Ming Fong 謝明晃 | RO | 1 | 14 November 2018 | 05 June 2024 |
TSE Ming Fong 謝明晃 | RE | 9 | 14 November 2018 | |
TSE Ming Fong 謝明晃 | RE | 1 | 23 December 2011 | 14 November 2018 |
WAN Shing Lung 溫誠龍 | RO | 9 | 03 March 2020 | |
WAN Shing Lung 溫誠龍 | RO | 4 | 03 March 2020 | |
WAN Shing Lung 溫誠龍 | RO | 1 | 03 March 2020 | |
WAN Shing Lung 溫誠龍 | RE | 9 | 24 January 2020 | 03 March 2020 |
WAN Shing Lung 溫誠龍 | RE | 4 | 24 January 2020 | 03 March 2020 |
WAN Shing Lung 溫誠龍 | RE | 1 | 24 January 2020 | 03 March 2020 |
WAT Hin Pong 屈顯邦 | RO | 1 | 28 August 2009 | 03 February 2017 |
WU Ka Ho, Stanley 胡嘉浩 | RE | 1 | 01 June 2015 | 09 January 2019 |