SFC Licenceholders of ICBC Credit Suisse Asset Management (International) Company Limited 工銀瑞信資產管理(國際)有限公司
- enquiries@icbccs.com.hk
- Website
- www.icbccs.com.hk
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CAO Guanye 曹冠業 | RE | 9 | 28 August 2013 | 28 July 2015 |
CAO Guanye 曹冠業 | RE | 4 | 28 August 2013 | 28 July 2015 |
CAO Jiaqi 曹嘉琪 | RO | 9 | 24 April 2020 | 22 July 2021 |
CAO Jiaqi 曹嘉琪 | RO | 1 | 24 April 2020 | 29 July 2021 |
CAO Jiaqi 曹嘉琪 | RO | 4 | 24 April 2020 | 29 July 2021 |
CHAN Kiu Dik, Dixon 陳翹荻 | RE | 9 | 09 November 2012 | 12 October 2013 |
CHAN Kiu Dik, Dixon 陳翹荻 | RE | 4 | 09 November 2012 | 12 October 2013 |
CHANG Ming 昌明 | RE | 4 | 04 August 2014 | 03 December 2015 |
CHANG Ming 昌明 | RE | 9 | 04 August 2014 | 03 December 2015 |
CHAU Man Fai, Ricky 周文輝 | RE | 1 | 16 March 2016 | 31 March 2016 |
CHAU Man Fai, Ricky 周文輝 | RE | 4 | 06 August 2015 | 31 March 2016 |
CHAU Man Fai, Ricky 周文輝 | RE | 9 | 06 August 2015 | 31 March 2016 |
CHEN Bolun 陳伯倫 | RE | 9 | 24 September 2019 | 24 March 2020 |
CHEN Bolun 陳伯倫 | RE | 4 | 24 September 2019 | 24 March 2020 |
CHEN Bolun 陳伯倫 | RE | 1 | 24 September 2019 | 24 March 2020 |
CHEN Chi Ho 陳志豪 | RE | 1 | 27 April 2017 | 27 October 2017 |
CHEN Chi Ho 陳志豪 | RE | 9 | 27 April 2017 | 27 October 2017 |
CHEN Chi Ho 陳志豪 | RO | 1 | 27 October 2017 | 15 February 2019 |
CHEN Chi Ho 陳志豪 | RO | 4 | 27 October 2017 | 15 February 2019 |
CHEN Chi Ho 陳志豪 | RO | 9 | 27 October 2017 | 15 February 2019 |
CHEN Chi Ho 陳志豪 | RE | 4 | 27 April 2017 | 27 October 2017 |
CHEN Geng 陳耕 | RE | 1 | 16 March 2016 | 18 January 2017 |
CHEN Geng 陳耕 | RO | 1 | 18 January 2017 | 27 October 2017 |
CHEN Geng 陳耕 | RE | 4 | 03 January 2014 | 27 October 2017 |
CHEN Geng 陳耕 | RE | 9 | 03 January 2014 | 27 October 2017 |
CHEN Guidu 陳桂都 | RE | 9 | 30 December 2014 | |
CHEN Guidu 陳桂都 | RE | 4 | 30 December 2014 | |
CHEN Han 陳涵 | RE | 4 | 07 April 2020 | |
CHEN Han 陳涵 | RE | 9 | 07 April 2020 | |
CHEN Xi 陳曦 | RE | 1 | 15 October 2019 | 09 July 2021 |
CHEN Xi 陳曦 | RE | 4 | 23 September 2019 | 09 July 2021 |
CHEN Zefeng 陳澤鋒 | RE | 9 | 04 August 2017 | 11 September 2019 |
CHEN Zefeng 陳澤鋒 | RO | 1 | 23 January 2018 | 11 September 2019 |
CHEN Zefeng 陳澤鋒 | RE | 4 | 04 August 2017 | 11 September 2019 |
CHEN Zefeng 陳澤鋒 | RE | 1 | 04 August 2017 | 23 January 2018 |
CHU Wing Hei 朱榮熙 | RE | 4 | 10 December 2015 | 10 April 2017 |
CHU Wing Hei 朱榮熙 | RE | 9 | 10 December 2015 | 10 April 2017 |
CHUA Sui Yee 蔡瑞怡 | RE | 1 | 16 March 2016 | 21 August 2016 |
CHUA Sui Yee 蔡瑞怡 | RE | 9 | 04 March 2015 | 21 August 2016 |
CHUA Sui Yee 蔡瑞怡 | RE | 4 | 04 March 2015 | 21 August 2016 |
CHUNG Ki Fung 鍾奇峰 | RE | 1 | 09 May 2018 | 24 July 2018 |
CHUNG Ki Fung 鍾奇峰 | RE | 4 | 16 May 2018 | 24 July 2018 |
CHUNG Ki Fung 鍾奇峰 | RE | 9 | 16 May 2018 | 24 July 2018 |
CUI Xueying 崔雪鶯 | RE | 9 | 04 March 2015 | 22 April 2017 |
CUI Xueying 崔雪鶯 | RE | 4 | 04 March 2015 | 22 April 2017 |
FAN Zhuoyi 范卓一 | RO | 4 | 15 September 2021 | 15 February 2022 |
FAN Zhuoyi 范卓一 | RO | 1 | 15 September 2021 | 15 February 2022 |
FAN Zhuoyi 范卓一 | RE | 1 | 05 February 2021 | 15 September 2021 |
FAN Zhuoyi 范卓一 | RE | 4 | 05 February 2021 | 15 September 2021 |
FUNG Paak Khui 馮百駒 | RE | 9 | 13 May 2015 | 30 December 2016 |
FUNG Paak Khui 馮百駒 | RE | 4 | 13 May 2015 | 30 December 2016 |
GENG Jiachen 耿家琛 | RE | 1 | 22 December 2022 | |
GENG Jiachen 耿家琛 | RE | 9 | 10 May 2021 | |
GENG Jiachen 耿家琛 | RE | 4 | 10 May 2021 | |
GU Heng 谷衡 | RE | 9 | 17 August 2020 | |
GU Heng 谷衡 | RE | 4 | 17 August 2020 | |
HAO Kang 郝康 | RO | 9 | 25 November 2016 | 30 April 2020 |
HAO Kang 郝康 | RO | 4 | 25 November 2016 | 30 April 2020 |
HAO Kang 郝康 | RE | 4 | 01 September 2016 | 25 November 2016 |
HAO Kang 郝康 | RE | 9 | 01 September 2016 | 25 November 2016 |
HAO Kang 郝康 | RO | 9 | 18 November 2011 | 26 November 2013 |
HAO Kang 郝康 | RO | 4 | 18 November 2011 | 26 November 2013 |
HE Chuangli 何闖立 | RE | 9 | 20 November 2017 | 08 October 2020 |
HE Chuangli 何闖立 | RE | 4 | 20 November 2017 | 08 October 2020 |
HO Amanda Jean 何婧 | RE | 9 | 06 October 2016 | 13 July 2018 |
HO Amanda Jean 何婧 | RE | 4 | 06 October 2016 | 13 July 2018 |
HUANG Zhengzheng 黃錚錚 | RE | 4 | 30 January 2014 | 24 October 2014 |
HUANG Zhengzheng 黃錚錚 | RE | 9 | 30 January 2014 | 24 October 2014 |
JIANG Mingbo 江明波 | RO | 9 | 16 June 2015 | 12 March 2018 |
JIANG Mingbo 江明波 | RO | 4 | 16 June 2015 | 12 March 2018 |
JIANG Mingbo 江明波 | RE | 4 | 18 February 2013 | 16 June 2015 |
JIANG Mingbo 江明波 | RE | 9 | 18 February 2013 | 16 June 2015 |
JIANG Zhi 姜志 | RE | 9 | 24 November 2017 | 15 February 2019 |
JIANG Zhi 姜志 | RE | 1 | 24 November 2017 | 15 February 2019 |
JIANG Zhi 姜志 | RE | 4 | 24 November 2017 | 15 February 2019 |
KONG Lingbing 孔令兵 | RE | 1 | 27 January 2023 | |
KONG Lingbing 孔令兵 | RE | 9 | 02 September 2020 | 20 May 2021 |
KONG Lingbing 孔令兵 | RE | 4 | 02 September 2020 | 20 May 2021 |
KONG Lingbing 孔令兵 | RO | 4 | 20 May 2021 | |
KONG Lingbing 孔令兵 | RO | 9 | 20 May 2021 | |
LI Dan 李丹 | RO | 1 | 27 February 2023 | |
LI Dan 李丹 | RO | 9 | 18 January 2018 | |
LI Dan 李丹 | RO | 4 | 18 January 2018 | |
LI Dan 李丹 | RE | 9 | 07 April 2017 | 18 January 2018 |
LI Dan 李丹 | RE | 4 | 07 April 2017 | 18 January 2018 |
LI Shiying 李詩穎 | RE | 9 | 21 May 2015 | 31 December 2015 |
LI Shiying 李詩穎 | RE | 4 | 21 May 2015 | 31 December 2015 |
LI Wanqing 李婉晴 | RE | 1 | 07 January 2022 | 28 July 2022 |
LI Wanqing 李婉晴 | RE | 4 | 07 January 2022 | 28 July 2022 |
LI Zipeng 李子鵬 | RE | 1 | 20 December 2022 | |
LI Zipeng 李子鵬 | RE | 4 | 22 June 2020 | |
LI Zipeng 李子鵬 | RE | 9 | 22 June 2020 | |
LIU Ting 劉婷 | RE | 9 | 06 November 2020 | |
LIU Ting 劉婷 | RE | 4 | 06 November 2020 | |
LU Yang 陸楊 | RE | 1 | 20 December 2022 | |
LU Yang 陸楊 | RE | 9 | 14 June 2022 | |
LU Yang 陸楊 | RE | 4 | 14 June 2022 | |
LUI Laura 呂靄華 | RO | 1 | 05 September 2016 | 25 November 2016 |
LUI Laura 呂靄華 | RE | 9 | 19 November 2015 | 25 November 2016 |
LUI Laura 呂靄華 | RE | 4 | 19 November 2015 | 25 November 2016 |
LUI Laura 呂靄華 | RE | 1 | 16 March 2016 | 05 September 2016 |
LUO Lingxiao 羅淩霄 | RE | 9 | 18 July 2019 | 13 November 2020 |
LUO Lingxiao 羅淩霄 | RE | 1 | 18 July 2019 | 13 November 2020 |
LUO Lingxiao 羅淩霄 | RE | 4 | 18 July 2019 | 13 November 2020 |
MAI Ellie 麥倚樺 | RE | 4 | 20 April 2016 | 30 December 2016 |
MAI Ellie 麥倚樺 | RE | 9 | 20 April 2016 | 30 December 2016 |
PAN Hailin 潘海琳 | RE | 9 | 29 February 2016 | 15 August 2016 |
PAN Hailin 潘海琳 | RE | 4 | 29 February 2016 | 15 August 2016 |
PANG Man Wai 彭敏惠 | RE | 9 | 25 July 2016 | 19 July 2018 |
PANG Man Wai 彭敏惠 | RE | 4 | 25 July 2016 | 19 July 2018 |
PANG Man Wai 彭敏惠 | RE | 1 | 25 July 2016 | 19 July 2018 |
PENG Shulin 彭樹林 | RO | 4 | 15 October 2020 | 29 July 2021 |
PENG Shulin 彭樹林 | RO | 1 | 15 October 2020 | 29 July 2021 |
PENG Shulin 彭樹林 | RO | 9 | 20 May 2021 | 29 July 2021 |
SHAO Ying 邵贏 | RE | 4 | 18 April 2017 | 22 May 2019 |
SHAO Ying 邵贏 | RE | 9 | 18 April 2017 | 22 May 2019 |
SHAO Ying 邵贏 | RE | 1 | 18 April 2017 | 22 May 2019 |
SHEN Xiaomin 沈晓民 | RE | 9 | 28 August 2013 | 31 December 2015 |
SHEN Xiaomin 沈晓民 | RE | 4 | 28 August 2013 | 31 December 2015 |
SONG Bingshen 宋炳珅 | RE | 4 | 23 February 2015 | 04 September 2017 |
SONG Bingshen 宋炳珅 | RE | 9 | 23 February 2015 | 04 September 2017 |
SUN Derrick 孫裕文 | RO | 9 | 27 August 2020 | 11 January 2021 |
SUN Derrick 孫裕文 | RO | 4 | 27 August 2020 | 11 January 2021 |
SUN Derrick 孫裕文 | RE | 1 | 27 August 2018 | 11 January 2021 |
SUN Derrick 孫裕文 | RE | 9 | 12 July 2018 | 27 August 2020 |
SUN Derrick 孫裕文 | RE | 4 | 12 July 2018 | 27 August 2020 |
SUN Qirong 孫琦蓉 | RE | 1 | 25 October 2018 | 30 April 2019 |
SUN Qirong 孫琦蓉 | RE | 4 | 25 October 2018 | 30 April 2019 |
SUN Qirong 孫琦蓉 | RE | 9 | 25 October 2018 | 30 April 2019 |
SUN Xinyue 孫心悅 | RO | 1 | 13 December 2022 | |
SUN Xinyue 孫心悅 | RE | 1 | 21 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 |
SUN Xinyue 孫心悅 | RE | 4 | 21 April 2022 | |
TANG Richard Hua 唐華 | RO | 1 | 05 February 2016 | 03 June 2019 |
TANG Richard Hua 唐華 | RO | 4 | 18 November 2013 | 19 February 2019 |
TANG Richard Hua 唐華 | RO | 9 | 18 November 2013 | 19 February 2019 |
TANG Richard Hua 唐華 | RE | 4 | 08 August 2013 | 18 November 2013 |
TANG Richard Hua 唐華 | RE | 9 | 08 August 2013 | 18 November 2013 |
TSE Kwok Ting 謝幗婷 | RE | 9 | 09 September 2013 | 20 May 2015 |
TSE Kwok Ting 謝幗婷 | RE | 4 | 09 September 2013 | 20 May 2015 |
WANG Qingren 王慶仁 | RO | 9 | 22 January 2019 | 18 March 2020 |
WANG Qingren 王慶仁 | RO | 1 | 22 January 2019 | 18 March 2020 |
WANG Qingren 王慶仁 | RO | 4 | 22 January 2019 | 18 March 2020 |
WANG Xiaowei 王晓韋 | RE | 4 | 06 October 2017 | 14 December 2018 |
WANG Xiaowei 王晓韋 | RE | 9 | 06 October 2017 | 14 December 2018 |
WANG Xinyi 王馨怡 | RE | 4 | 26 July 2022 | |
WANG Xinyi 王馨怡 | RE | 1 | 26 July 2022 | |
WANG Yang 汪颺 | RO | 9 | 05 August 2021 | 27 July 2022 |
WANG Yang 汪颺 | RO | 1 | 05 January 2021 | 01 March 2023 |
WANG Yang 汪颺 | RO | 4 | 05 January 2021 | 01 March 2023 |
WEI Jeanette | RE | 1 | 05 September 2019 | |
WEI Jeanette | RE | 4 | 05 September 2019 | |
WEI Jeanette | RE | 9 | 05 September 2019 | |
WENG Jimmy J 翁濟富 | RE | 9 | 13 May 2016 | 13 December 2016 |
WENG Jimmy J 翁濟富 | RE | 4 | 13 May 2016 | 13 December 2016 |
WENG Jimmy J 翁濟富 | RE | 1 | 12 October 2016 | 28 February 2019 |
WENG Jimmy J 翁濟富 | RO | 4 | 13 December 2016 | 28 February 2019 |
WENG Jimmy J 翁濟富 | RO | 9 | 13 December 2016 | 28 February 2019 |
WENG Jimmy J 翁濟富 | RE | 9 | 21 May 2012 | 30 September 2013 |
WENG Jimmy J 翁濟富 | RE | 4 | 21 May 2012 | 30 September 2013 |
WONG Chi Ching Juliet 王子晴 | RE | 4 | 06 November 2019 | 11 June 2021 |
WONG Chi Ching Juliet 王子晴 | RE | 1 | 06 November 2019 | 11 June 2021 |
WONG Doris Yuk Ying 黃玉瑩 | RO | 4 | 02 September 2014 | 31 October 2015 |
WONG Doris Yuk Ying 黃玉瑩 | RO | 9 | 02 September 2014 | 31 October 2015 |
WONG Doris Yuk Ying 黃玉瑩 | RE | 9 | 20 December 2013 | 02 September 2014 |
WONG Doris Yuk Ying 黃玉瑩 | RE | 4 | 20 December 2013 | 02 September 2014 |
WONG Suet King, Eldora 王雪瓊 | RE | 9 | 12 February 2015 | 09 April 2015 |
WONG Suet King, Eldora 王雪瓊 | RE | 4 | 12 February 2015 | 09 April 2015 |
XI Wang 郗望 | RE | 1 | 22 December 2022 | |
XI Wang 郗望 | RE | 9 | 26 October 2022 | |
XI Wang 郗望 | RE | 4 | 26 October 2022 | |
XI Wang 郗望 | RE | 1 | 12 March 2019 | 24 May 2021 |
XI Wang 郗望 | RE | 4 | 12 March 2019 | 24 May 2021 |
XI Wang 郗望 | RE | 9 | 12 March 2019 | 24 May 2021 |
XIA Hongbin 夏洪彬 | RO | 4 | 18 November 2011 | 10 July 2014 |
XIA Hongbin 夏洪彬 | RO | 9 | 18 November 2011 | 10 July 2014 |
XIAO Xu 肖旭 | RE | 9 | 28 March 2024 | |
XIAO Xu 肖旭 | RE | 4 | 28 March 2024 | |
XIAO Xu 肖旭 | RE | 1 | 28 March 2024 | |
XU Lili 徐麗麗 | RO | 4 | 18 November 2011 | 05 September 2014 |
XU Lili 徐麗麗 | RO | 9 | 18 November 2011 | 05 September 2014 |
YAN Kei Shui, Leo 甄祺瑞 | RE | 4 | 22 June 2021 | 15 September 2022 |
YAN Kei Shui, Leo 甄祺瑞 | RE | 9 | 22 June 2021 | 15 September 2022 |
YANG Rui 楊睿 | RO | 1 | 11 October 2019 | 13 August 2021 |
YANG Rui 楊睿 | RE | 4 | 30 August 2017 | 13 August 2021 |
YANG Rui 楊睿 | RE | 9 | 30 August 2017 | 13 August 2021 |
YANG Xue 楊雪 | RE | 4 | 17 April 2020 | 18 October 2020 |
YANG Xue 楊雪 | RE | 1 | 17 April 2020 | 18 October 2020 |
YANG Xue 楊雪 | RE | 9 | 08 October 2018 | 05 January 2020 |
YANG Xue 楊雪 | RE | 4 | 08 October 2018 | 05 January 2020 |
YANG Xue 楊雪 | RE | 1 | 08 October 2018 | 05 January 2020 |
YIN Ada Manyee 阮敏儀 | RO | 4 | 07 May 2019 | 30 September 2022 |
YIN Ada Manyee 阮敏儀 | RO | 9 | 07 May 2019 | 30 September 2022 |
YIN Ada Manyee 阮敏儀 | RE | 9 | 05 April 2017 | 07 May 2019 |
YIN Ada Manyee 阮敏儀 | RE | 4 | 05 April 2017 | 07 May 2019 |
YIP Ming Kwan 葉明君 | RE | 9 | 16 May 2017 | 08 November 2017 |
YIP Ming Kwan 葉明君 | RE | 4 | 16 May 2017 | 08 November 2017 |
YIP Ming Kwan 葉明君 | RE | 1 | 16 May 2017 | 08 November 2017 |
YU Lijie 俞勵頡 | RE | 4 | 16 December 2016 | 16 May 2022 |
YU Lijie 俞勵頡 | RE | 9 | 16 December 2016 | 16 May 2022 |
YU Tin Yau, Elvin 余天佑 | RO | 1 | 05 February 2016 | 06 July 2016 |
YU Tin Yau, Elvin 余天佑 | RO | 4 | 25 November 2015 | 06 July 2016 |
YU Tin Yau, Elvin 余天佑 | RE | 9 | 17 September 2015 | 06 July 2016 |
YU Tin Yau, Elvin 余天佑 | RE | 4 | 17 September 2015 | 25 November 2015 |
ZENG Fang 曾方 | RE | 1 | 22 November 2017 | 30 June 2019 |
ZENG Fang 曾方 | RE | 4 | 22 November 2017 | 30 June 2019 |
ZENG Fang 曾方 | RE | 9 | 22 November 2017 | 30 June 2019 |
ZHANG Chunsheng 張春生 | RO | 9 | 14 February 2022 | |
ZHANG Chunsheng 張春生 | RO | 4 | 14 February 2022 | |
ZHANG Chunsheng 張春生 | RO | 1 | 14 February 2022 | |
ZHANG Dong 張棟 | RE | 9 | 08 September 2022 | |
ZHANG Dong 張棟 | RE | 1 | 19 April 2022 | |
ZHANG Dong 張棟 | RE | 4 | 19 April 2022 | |
ZHANG Xueqi 張雪琪 | RE | 1 | 23 February 2018 | 11 October 2019 |
ZHANG Xueqi 張雪琪 | RE | 4 | 23 February 2018 | 11 October 2019 |
ZHANG Xueqi 張雪琪 | RE | 9 | 23 February 2018 | 11 October 2019 |
ZHAO Xu 赵栩 | RO | 9 | 01 March 2022 | |
ZHOU Rongrong 周融榮 | RE | 9 | 30 November 2012 | 09 May 2014 |
ZHOU Rongrong 周融榮 | RE | 4 | 30 November 2012 | 09 May 2014 |
ZHUANG Lijing 庄黎靜 | RE | 4 | 26 October 2016 | 17 May 2017 |
ZHUANG Lijing 庄黎靜 | RE | 9 | 26 October 2016 | 17 May 2017 |
ZHUO Le 卓樂 | RE | 4 | 08 September 2022 | |
ZHUO Le 卓樂 | RE | 1 | 08 September 2022 |