SFC Licenceholders of SDHG International Asset Management Limited 山高國際資產管理有限公司
- compliance@sdhg.com.hk
- Website
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHAN Hei Wai, Henry 陳晞瑋 | RE | 9 | 16 March 2015 | 07 September 2016 |
CHAN Hei Wai, Henry 陳晞瑋 | RE | 6 | 08 January 2014 | 07 September 2016 |
CHAN Hei Wai, Henry 陳晞瑋 | RE | 5 | 13 November 2012 | 07 September 2016 |
CHAN Hei Wai, Henry 陳晞瑋 | RE | 4 | 13 November 2012 | 07 September 2016 |
CHAN Shu Kai 陳樹基 | RE | 9 | 02 December 2008 | 07 July 2009 |
CHAN Shu Kai 陳樹基 | RO | 9 | 07 July 2009 | 05 September 2015 |
CHAN Shu Kai 陳樹基 | RO | 5 | 02 December 2008 | 05 September 2015 |
CHEN Chuang 陳闖 | RE | 9 | 21 September 2020 | |
CHEN Chuang 陳闖 | RE | 4 | 21 September 2020 | |
CHEN Daqi 陳達祺 | RE | 6 | 09 April 2020 | |
CHONG Ka Yee 莊嘉誼 | RO | 5 | 18 February 2021 | 26 October 2021 |
CHONG Ka Yee 莊嘉誼 | RO | 4 | 18 February 2021 | 26 October 2021 |
CHONG Ka Yee 莊嘉誼 | RO | 9 | 18 February 2021 | 26 October 2021 |
CUI Shuo 崔碩 | RE | 4 | 21 August 2020 | 19 March 2021 |
FAN Jianqiao 范建橋 | RE | 9 | 29 January 2019 | |
FAN Jianqiao 范建橋 | RE | 4 | 26 August 2019 | |
FENG Yibiao 馮一飆 | RE | 4 | 25 May 2020 | |
FENG Yibiao 馮一飆 | RE | 9 | 20 April 2020 | |
HO Ching Man, Teresa 何靜文 | RO | 6 | 23 February 2021 | |
HONG Xueting 洪雪庭 | RO | 9 | 19 February 2020 | |
HONG Xueting 洪雪庭 | RE | 4 | 21 October 2019 | |
HONG Xueting 洪雪庭 | RE | 9 | 19 December 2018 | 19 February 2020 |
HONG Xueting 洪雪庭 | RE | 6 | 19 December 2018 | 21 October 2019 |
JIANG Jiayan 蔣嘉芫 | RO | 4 | 28 November 2019 | 24 December 2019 |
JIANG Jiayan 蔣嘉芫 | RE | 9 | 06 November 2019 | 24 December 2019 |
JIANG Jiayan 蔣嘉芫 | RE | 4 | 06 November 2019 | 28 November 2019 |
JING Ruochong 井若冲 | RE | 4 | 10 August 2020 | 30 September 2020 |
JING Ruochong 井若冲 | RO | 9 | 30 September 2020 | 12 February 2022 |
JING Ruochong 井若冲 | RO | 4 | 30 September 2020 | 12 February 2022 |
JING Ruochong 井若冲 | RE | 9 | 10 August 2020 | 30 September 2020 |
KOK Kam Fu 郭錦富 | RE | 6 | 19 December 2012 | 19 March 2016 |
KOK Kam Fu 郭錦富 | RE | 9 | 05 December 2012 | 19 March 2016 |
KOK Kam Fu 郭錦富 | RE | 5 | 05 December 2012 | 19 March 2016 |
KOK Kam Fu 郭錦富 | RE | 4 | 05 December 2012 | 19 March 2016 |
KWOK Shun Tim 郭純恬 | RO | 9 | 06 February 2012 | 05 February 2013 |
KWOK Shun Tim 郭純恬 | RO | 6 | 02 December 2008 | 05 February 2013 |
KWOK Shun Tim 郭純恬 | RO | 4 | 02 December 2008 | 05 February 2013 |
KWOK Shun Tim 郭純恬 | RE | 9 | 02 December 2008 | 06 February 2012 |
LAI Cheuk Hong 黎卓匡 | RO | 6 | 11 December 2013 | 30 April 2016 |
LAI Cheuk Hong 黎卓匡 | RE | 6 | 20 November 2013 | 11 December 2013 |
LAI Cheuk Hong 黎卓匡 | RO | 6 | 15 April 2013 | 15 October 2013 |
LAI Cheuk Hong 黎卓匡 | RE | 6 | 02 December 2009 | 15 April 2013 |
LAM Leung Sang Andrew 林亮生 | RE | 6 | 21 May 2019 | 20 December 2019 |
LAM Leung Sang Andrew 林亮生 | RE | 5 | 21 May 2019 | 20 December 2019 |
LAM Leung Sang Andrew 林亮生 | RE | 4 | 21 May 2019 | 20 December 2019 |
LAM Leung Sang Andrew 林亮生 | RE | 9 | 19 March 2019 | 20 December 2019 |
LAM Wo Hui 林和煦 | RO | 5 | 25 August 2015 | 01 September 2016 |
LAM Wo Hui 林和煦 | RE | 5 | 29 July 2015 | 25 August 2015 |
LEUNG Kim Hung 梁劍虹 | RE | 9 | 02 December 2008 | 18 September 2009 |
LEUNG Kim Hung 梁劍虹 | RE | 6 | 02 December 2008 | 18 September 2009 |
LEUNG Kim Hung 梁劍虹 | RE | 4 | 02 December 2008 | 18 September 2009 |
LEUNG Wai Keung, Lawrence 梁偉強 | RE | 9 | 05 January 2012 | 15 June 2012 |
LEUNG Wai Keung, Lawrence 梁偉強 | RE | 4 | 05 January 2012 | 15 June 2012 |
LEUNG Yin Wah, Evelyn 梁燕華 | RO | 9 | 17 February 2012 | 23 October 2014 |
LEUNG Yin Wah, Evelyn 梁燕華 | RO | 4 | 02 December 2008 | 23 October 2014 |
LEUNG Yin Wah, Evelyn 梁燕華 | RE | 9 | 02 December 2008 | 17 February 2012 |
LIANG Sijin 梁思晉 | RE | 9 | 08 October 2021 | 30 November 2022 |
LIANG Sijin 梁思晉 | RE | 4 | 08 October 2021 | 30 November 2022 |
LIU Han 劉涵 | RE | 9 | 03 July 2019 | 16 August 2019 |
LIU Han 劉涵 | RE | 4 | 03 July 2019 | 16 August 2019 |
LIU Jian 劉見 | RE | 4 | 20 January 2023 | 10 February 2024 |
LIU Jian 劉見 | RE | 9 | 06 January 2023 | 10 February 2024 |
LIU Yao 劉堯 | RO | 9 | 06 July 2022 | |
LIU Yao 劉堯 | RO | 4 | 06 July 2022 | |
LIU Yujie 劉俞頡 | RO | 9 | 13 January 2020 | 20 January 2020 |
LIU Ziyuan 劉子源 | RE | 9 | 31 October 2019 | 08 April 2020 |
LIU Ziyuan 劉子源 | RE | 4 | 31 October 2019 | 08 April 2020 |
LUK Tai Choi 陸棣才 | RO | 9 | 02 December 2008 | 02 November 2012 |
LUK Tai Choi 陸棣才 | RO | 4 | 02 December 2008 | 02 November 2012 |
MUI Chok Wah 梅作華 | RE | 9 | 20 October 2009 | 01 December 2009 |
MUI Chok Wah 梅作華 | RE | 6 | 20 October 2009 | 01 December 2009 |
MUI Chok Wah 梅作華 | RE | 4 | 20 October 2009 | 01 December 2009 |
MUI Chok Wah 梅作華 | RE | 5 | 29 October 2009 | 01 December 2009 |
NG Fai Nam 吳徽男 | RE | 9 | 05 November 2014 | 05 September 2015 |
NG Fai Nam 吳徽男 | RE | 6 | 05 November 2014 | 05 September 2015 |
NG Fai Nam 吳徽男 | RE | 5 | 05 November 2014 | 05 September 2015 |
NG Fai Nam 吳徽男 | RO | 4 | 06 February 2014 | 05 September 2015 |
NG Fai Nam 吳徽男 | RE | 4 | 24 March 2009 | 06 February 2014 |
NG Kai Shing 吳啟誠 | RE | 6 | 02 March 2010 | 06 September 2011 |
ORR Joseph Wai Shing 柯偉聲 | RE | 9 | 24 September 2009 | 07 October 2009 |
ORR Joseph Wai Shing 柯偉聲 | RE | 6 | 24 September 2009 | 07 October 2009 |
PANG Leung Wai, Andrew 彭量為 | RO | 9 | 27 August 2015 | 01 March 2016 |
PANG Leung Wai, Andrew 彭量為 | RO | 4 | 27 August 2015 | 01 March 2016 |
QIN Haodong 秦浩東 | RE | 9 | 21 February 2020 | 31 May 2022 |
QIN Haodong 秦浩東 | RE | 4 | 21 February 2020 | 31 May 2022 |
RAO Chao 饒超 | RO | 4 | 31 January 2020 | 06 June 2020 |
RAO Chao 饒超 | RO | 9 | 31 January 2020 | 06 June 2020 |
RAO Chao 饒超 | RE | 4 | 02 December 2019 | 31 January 2020 |
RAO Chao 饒超 | RE | 9 | 02 December 2019 | 31 January 2020 |
SEE Lee Seng, Reason 史理生 | RO | 9 | 02 December 2008 | 08 February 2019 |
SEE Lee Seng, Reason 史理生 | RO | 6 | 02 December 2008 | 08 February 2019 |
SEE Lee Seng, Reason 史理生 | RO | 5 | 02 December 2008 | 08 February 2019 |
SEE Lee Seng, Reason 史理生 | RO | 4 | 02 December 2008 | 08 February 2019 |
WANG Yao 王瑤 | RE | 4 | 31 October 2019 | 22 June 2020 |
WANG Yao 王瑤 | RE | 5 | 31 October 2019 | 22 June 2020 |
WANG Yao 王瑤 | RE | 9 | 22 January 2019 | 22 June 2020 |
WANG Zijian 王子健 | RE | 4 | 22 January 2020 | |
WANG Zijian 王子健 | RE | 9 | 22 January 2020 | |
WEN Bo 溫渤 | RE | 9 | 05 March 2019 | 07 July 2020 |
WONG Albert Ka Wah 黃家華 | RO | 9 | 05 July 2011 | 02 November 2012 |
WONG Albert Ka Wah 黃家華 | RE | 9 | 18 April 2011 | 05 July 2011 |
WONG Yau Shing 黃有成 | RO | 9 | 11 April 2016 | |
WONG Yau Shing 黃有成 | RO | 6 | 11 April 2016 | |
WONG Yau Shing 黃有成 | RO | 5 | 11 April 2016 | |
WONG Yau Shing 黃有成 | RO | 4 | 11 April 2016 | |
WONG Yau Shing 黃有成 | RE | 9 | 18 December 2013 | 11 April 2016 |
WONG Yau Shing 黃有成 | RE | 6 | 18 December 2013 | 11 April 2016 |
WONG Yau Shing 黃有成 | RE | 5 | 18 December 2013 | 11 April 2016 |
WONG Yau Shing 黃有成 | RE | 4 | 18 December 2013 | 11 April 2016 |
WU Kwok Leung 胡國良 | RO | 9 | 12 March 2019 | 03 July 2020 |
WU Kwok Leung 胡國良 | RO | 4 | 12 March 2019 | 03 July 2020 |
WU Kwok Leung 胡國良 | RE | 6 | 12 March 2019 | 03 July 2020 |
WU Kwok Leung 胡國良 | RO | 5 | 12 March 2019 | 03 July 2020 |
WU Kwok Leung 胡國良 | RE | 9 | 23 January 2019 | 12 March 2019 |
WU Kwok Leung 胡國良 | RE | 4 | 23 January 2019 | 12 March 2019 |
WU Yiwen 吳昳雯 | RE | 4 | 16 May 2019 | 25 June 2021 |
WU Yiwen 吳昳雯 | RE | 9 | 16 May 2019 | 25 June 2021 |
XIE Yangping 謝揚平 | RE | 4 | 28 December 2020 | |
XIE Yangping 謝揚平 | RE | 9 | 28 December 2020 | |
YANG Qi 楊麒 | RO | 5 | 13 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 |
YANG Qi 楊麒 | RO | 9 | 20 July 2020 | 20 March 2021 |
YANG Qi 楊麒 | RE | 4 | 20 May 2020 | 20 July 2020 |
YANG Qi 楊麒 | RE | 9 | 20 May 2020 | 20 July 2020 |
YANG Qi 楊麒 | RO | 4 | 20 July 2020 | 20 March 2021 |
YANG Qi 楊麒 | RO | 4 | 24 June 2021 | |
YANG Qi 楊麒 | RO | 9 | 24 June 2021 | |
YU Shui Sang, Bernard 余瑞生 | RO | 9 | 13 June 2018 | 03 January 2021 |
YU Shui Sang, Bernard 余瑞生 | RO | 6 | 13 June 2018 | 03 January 2021 |
YU Shui Sang, Bernard 余瑞生 | RO | 5 | 13 June 2018 | 03 January 2021 |
YU Shui Sang, Bernard 余瑞生 | RO | 4 | 13 June 2018 | 03 January 2021 |
YU Shui Sang, Bernard 余瑞生 | RE | 9 | 02 May 2018 | 13 June 2018 |
YU Shui Sang, Bernard 余瑞生 | RE | 4 | 02 May 2018 | 13 June 2018 |
YU Tian 于天 | RE | 4 | 18 August 2020 | |
YU Tian 于天 | RE | 9 | 18 August 2020 | |
ZHAN Weikang 詹衛康 | RE | 9 | 18 March 2020 | 27 August 2022 |
ZHAN Weikang 詹衛康 | RE | 4 | 18 March 2020 | 27 August 2022 |
ZHENG Tao 鄭濤 | RE | 9 | 01 November 2019 | 31 July 2024 |
ZHENG Tao 鄭濤 | RE | 4 | 01 November 2019 | 31 July 2024 |
ZHONG Xuqi 鍾旭麒 | RO | 5 | 11 November 2022 | |
ZHONG Xuqi 鍾旭麒 | RO | 9 | 04 January 2019 | |
ZHONG Xuqi 鍾旭麒 | RO | 4 | 04 January 2019 | |
ZHU Kai 朱凱 | RE | 4 | 29 June 2020 | 09 January 2022 |
ZHU Kai 朱凱 | RE | 9 | 29 June 2020 | 09 January 2022 |
ZHU Qianlan 朱倩嵐 | RE | 4 | 08 September 2021 | 10 February 2024 |
ZHUANG Wei 庄偉 | RE | 4 | 15 September 2020 | 04 December 2020 |
ZHUANG Wei 庄偉 | RE | 6 | 06 October 2020 | 19 September 2021 |
ZHUANG Wei 庄偉 | RE | 9 | 06 October 2020 | 19 September 2021 |
ZHUANG Wei 庄偉 | RO | 4 | 04 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 |