SFC Licenceholders of Central China International Capital Limited 中州國際融資有限公司
- elain.wong@ccnew.com.hk
- Website
- www.ccnew.com.hk
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
AU-YEUNG Yan Lun 歐陽欣麟 | RO | 1 | 29 April 2009 | 30 November 2013 |
AU-YEUNG Yan Lun 歐陽欣麟 | RO | 6 | 29 April 2008 | 30 November 2013 |
AU-YEUNG Yan Lun 歐陽欣麟 | RE | 1 | 02 February 2009 | 29 April 2009 |
AU-YEUNG Yan Lun 歐陽欣麟 | RE | 6 | 23 November 2004 | 29 April 2008 |
AU-YOUNG Hin Lap 歐陽顯立 | RE | 6 | 04 January 2017 | 06 November 2017 |
CAO Yuan 曹元 | RE | 6 | 04 April 2022 | 29 May 2023 |
CHAN Alvin Christopher Hung Kit 陳鴻傑 | RE | 6 | 13 August 2004 | 09 August 2005 |
CHAN Frank Clifford Shui Ting Chu 陳瑞庭 | RE | 6 | 19 April 2018 | 13 September 2022 |
CHAN Hi Kit 陳喜杰 | RE | 6 | 10 April 2007 | 14 February 2009 |
CHAN Lok Hei 陳樂熙 | RE | 6 | 24 April 2014 | 15 July 2015 |
CHAN Po Man 陳寶文 | RE | 6 | 18 July 2007 | 14 February 2009 |
CHAN Wai Hung 陳偉雄 | RO | 6 | 06 September 2022 | |
CHAN Wai Hung 陳偉雄 | RO | 1 | 06 September 2022 | |
CHAN Wai Hung 陳偉雄 | RE | 6 | 29 August 2022 | 06 September 2022 |
CHAN Wai Hung 陳偉雄 | RE | 1 | 29 August 2022 | 06 September 2022 |
CHAN Yan Yu Jessica 陳欣餘 | RE | 6 | 07 April 2021 | 04 January 2022 |
CHAN Yan Yu Jessica 陳欣餘 | RE | 1 | 02 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 |
CHEN Tianyang 陳天揚 | RE | 6 | 09 October 2017 | 25 July 2019 |
CHENG Tai Wai, David 鄭大衛 | RE | 6 | 07 April 2016 | 14 October 2016 |
CHENG Tai Wai, David 鄭大衛 | RE | 1 | 07 April 2016 | 14 October 2016 |
CHENG Tai Wai, David 鄭大衛 | RE | 6 | 06 September 2011 | 17 January 2013 |
CHEUNG Chung Wai, Billy 張仲威 | RO | 6 | 29 October 2008 | 15 November 2022 |
CHEUNG Chung Wai, Billy 張仲威 | RO | 1 | 18 May 2009 | 15 November 2022 |
CHEUNG Mandy 張证睎 | RE | 6 | 04 January 2016 | 28 February 2017 |
CHEUNG Wai Kay 張偉奇 | RO | 6 | 26 June 2007 | 15 February 2008 |
CHEUNG Yin Man, Monica 張彥文 | RO | 6 | 27 May 2024 | |
CHEUNG Yin Man, Monica 張彥文 | RE | 6 | 30 March 2023 | 27 May 2024 |
CHEUNG Yin Man, Monica 張彥文 | RE | 1 | 30 March 2023 | |
CHEUNG Yui Kai, Warren 張睿佳 | RO | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 30 April 2003 |
CHEUNG Yui Kai, Warren 張睿佳 | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 30 April 2003 |
CHEUNG Yui Kai, Warren 張睿佳 | RO | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 30 April 2003 |
CHEUNG Yui Kai, Warren 張睿佳 | RO | 1 | 01 April 2003 | 30 April 2003 |
CHIU Hin Fung, Sherman 趙衍鋒 | RO | 1 | 24 August 2011 | 27 April 2012 |
CHIU Hin Fung, Sherman 趙衍鋒 | RE | 1 | 04 May 2011 | 24 August 2011 |
CHU Pui Fan 朱佩芬 | RE | 6 | 17 May 2011 | 04 July 2011 |
CHUNG Pak Ki 鍾柏棋 | RE | 6 | 09 October 2017 | 09 October 2017 |
ENG Edmond 伍少凡 | RO | 4 | 26 June 2003 | 14 December 2004 |
ENG Edmond 伍少凡 | RO | 1 | 26 June 2003 | 06 December 2005 |
ENG Edmond 伍少凡 | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 20 December 2005 |
FAN Guangyi | RE | 6 | 02 April 2024 | |
FAN Guangyi | RE | 1 | 02 April 2024 | |
FONG Wai Ying, Vivian Catherine 方韋盈 | RE | 6 | 06 June 2017 | 31 July 2017 |
FONG Wai Ying, Vivian Catherine 方韋盈 | RE | 1 | 16 May 2017 | 31 July 2017 |
FOX Robin Jonathan Gibbs | RO | 6 | 03 November 2015 | 24 May 2016 |
FOX Robin Jonathan Gibbs | RO | 1 | 03 November 2015 | 24 May 2016 |
FOX Robin Jonathan Gibbs | RE | 6 | 10 July 2015 | 03 November 2015 |
FOX Robin Jonathan Gibbs | RE | 1 | 10 July 2015 | 03 November 2015 |
HARDING Simon Roderick | RO | 1 | 28 August 2007 | 01 September 2022 |
HARDING Simon Roderick | RO | 6 | 18 January 2007 | 01 September 2022 |
HO Sin Ying 何茜瑩 | RE | 6 | 12 January 2018 | 06 November 2018 |
HU Qiusheng 胡秋晟 | RE | 1 | 26 March 2024 | |
HU Qiusheng 胡秋晟 | RE | 6 | 08 June 2021 | |
IP Hung 葉虹 | RE | 6 | 09 November 2006 | 12 September 2007 |
IP Hung 葉虹 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 24 January 2006 |
IP Hung 葉虹 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 20 December 2004 |
IP Hung 葉虹 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 20 December 2004 |
IP Hung 葉虹 | RE | 1 | 01 April 2003 | 24 January 2006 |
JIA Meng 賈夢 | RE | 1 | 18 May 2018 | 22 May 2021 |
JIA Meng 賈夢 | RE | 6 | 21 June 2017 | 22 May 2021 |
JIANG Hongyan 蒋宏延 | RE | 6 | 10 May 2013 | 18 October 2013 |
KO Fei Fan Tommy 高飛帆 | RE | 6 | 12 June 2018 | 27 August 2020 |
KO Fei Fan Tommy 高飛帆 | RE | 1 | 12 June 2018 | 27 August 2020 |
KOO Pak Kin 古栢堅 | RO | 6 | 17 May 2007 | 13 April 2009 |
KOO Pak Kin 古栢堅 | RO | 1 | 17 May 2007 | 13 April 2009 |
KOO Pak Kin 古栢堅 | RE | 1 | 28 February 2007 | 17 May 2007 |
KOO Pak Kin 古栢堅 | RE | 6 | 28 February 2007 | 17 May 2007 |
KUNG Lea 龔澧 | RE | 6 | 10 April 2019 | 19 August 2019 |
KUNG Lea 龔澧 | RE | 1 | 10 April 2019 | 19 August 2019 |
LAM Daniel Tung Leung 林棟樑 | RE | 6 | 04 October 2013 | 01 December 2022 |
LAU Cin Yu 劉芊妤 | RE | 6 | 18 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 |
LAW Cho Kwan Derek 羅祖坤 | RE | 6 | 23 July 2021 | 01 December 2022 |
LEE Hin Pong 李顯邦 | RO | 1 | 30 October 2023 | 25 May 2024 |
LEE Hin Pong 李顯邦 | RE | 6 | 25 July 2023 | 25 May 2024 |
LEE Hin Pong 李顯邦 | RE | 1 | 25 July 2023 | 30 October 2023 |
LEE Yat Ming 李日明 | RE | 1 | 31 July 2008 | 02 April 2009 |
LEE Yat Ming 李日明 | RO | 1 | 28 August 2007 | 31 July 2008 |
LEUNG Hon Ki 梁漢旗 | RO | 6 | 22 May 2009 | 22 July 2009 |
LEUNG Hon Ki 梁漢旗 | RE | 6 | 12 May 2009 | 22 May 2009 |
LEUNG Kit Ming 梁傑明 | RE | 6 | 23 May 2011 | 31 May 2012 |
LI Ho Yin 李浩賢 | RE | 6 | 21 December 2016 | 04 September 2018 |
LI Jingming 李晶銘 | RE | 6 | 27 June 2022 | |
LI Jingming 李晶銘 | RE | 1 | 27 June 2022 | |
LI Kin Shing, Alan 李建承 | RE | 6 | 05 September 2006 | 18 October 2007 |
LI Nga Yee 李雅儀 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 14 September 2004 |
LI Nga Yee 李雅儀 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 14 September 2004 |
LI Nga Yee 李雅儀 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 07 May 2004 |
LI Xiaoqiang 李小强 | RO | 6 | 31 January 2018 | 03 November 2023 |
LI Xiaoqiang 李小强 | RO | 1 | 31 January 2018 | 03 November 2023 |
LI Xiaoqiang 李小强 | RE | 6 | 02 May 2017 | 31 January 2018 |
LI Yiting 李毅婷 | RE | 6 | 29 April 2019 | 09 July 2020 |
LI Yuk Kwan 李鈺堃 | RE | 6 | 31 May 2021 | 05 June 2021 |
LIM Swee Tin Lisa 林瑞珍 | RO | 1 | 23 July 2004 | 28 October 2005 |
LIN Chak Pui, Louis 林澤焙 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 27 February 2004 |
LIN Chak Pui, Louis 林澤焙 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 27 February 2004 |
LIN Chak Pui, Louis 林澤焙 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 27 February 2004 |
LIN King Yeung 連景揚 | RE | 6 | 10 May 2017 | 16 July 2018 |
LIN King Yeung 連景揚 | RE | 1 | 10 May 2017 | 16 July 2018 |
LIU Kam Yin 廖錦賢 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 25 September 2003 |
LIU Kam Yin 廖錦賢 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 24 September 2003 |
LIU Kam Yin 廖錦賢 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 24 September 2003 |
LIU Wing Yin, Wendy 廖穎賢 | RE | 6 | 10 August 2009 | 18 March 2011 |
LOCK Pik Shan, Ivy 駱碧珊 | RE | 6 | 06 January 2010 | 12 May 2011 |
LONG Jiabing 龍家冰 | RE | 1 | 26 August 2022 | 09 November 2023 |
MANG Yun Sun, George 孟潤燊 | RE | 6 | 26 November 2018 | 30 November 2019 |
MANG Yun Sun, George 孟潤燊 | RE | 1 | 11 September 2018 | 30 November 2019 |
NG Chak Chung 吳澤松 | RE | 1 | 08 March 2018 | 09 April 2018 |
NG Florence Man Shan 吳旻珊 | RE | 6 | 19 March 2018 | 20 March 2018 |
NG Tsz Ying 吳芷瑩 | RE | 6 | 04 January 2016 | 14 September 2016 |
PAN Wenxian Jocelyn 潘玟先 | RE | 6 | 18 September 2015 | 07 December 2015 |
PANG Hiu Ming 彭曉明 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 30 April 2003 |
PANG Hiu Ming 彭曉明 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 30 April 2003 |
PANG Hiu Ming 彭曉明 | RE | 1 | 01 April 2003 | 30 April 2003 |
PANG Hiu Ming 彭曉明 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 30 April 2003 |
PANG Wai Yuen, Marvin 彭偉源 | RO | 1 | 30 November 2016 | 05 January 2018 |
PANG Wai Yuen, Marvin 彭偉源 | RE | 6 | 19 April 2016 | 05 January 2018 |
PANG Wai Yuen, Marvin 彭偉源 | RE | 1 | 19 April 2016 | 30 November 2016 |
POK Ming Kai 卜銘佳 | RE | 6 | 16 July 2019 | 03 July 2020 |
POK Ming Kai 卜銘佳 | RE | 1 | 16 July 2019 | 03 July 2020 |
SO Raymond 蘇利民 | RE | 6 | 29 October 2007 | 02 November 2007 |
SUN Huali 孫華琍 | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 14 December 2007 |
SZE Chin Pei, Pacita 史君白 | RO | 1 | 08 December 2005 | 24 May 2006 |
SZE Chin Pei, Pacita 史君白 | RE | 1 | 27 April 2005 | 08 December 2005 |
SZE Chin Pei, Pacita 史君白 | RE | 6 | 27 April 2005 | 08 December 2005 |
SZE Chin Pei, Pacita 史君白 | RO | 6 | 08 December 2005 | 24 May 2006 |
TAI Nga Chun 戴雅真 | RE | 6 | 05 November 2013 | 10 January 2014 |
TAN Yazhi 譚雅之 | RE | 6 | 27 August 2020 | 06 January 2023 |
TANG Chun Fai, Billy 鄧振輝 | RE | 6 | 08 October 2004 | 08 June 2005 |
TO Kwok Chien, Ronald 杜國鍵 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 10 November 2003 |
TO Kwok Chien, Ronald 杜國鍵 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 10 November 2003 |
TO Kwok Chien, Ronald 杜國鍵 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 10 November 2003 |
TRAN Chuen Wah, John 陳傳華 | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 09 September 2003 |
TSANG Tak Chi 曾德芝 | RE | 6 | 08 April 2009 | 16 July 2009 |
TSE Yee Hin, Tony 謝宇軒 | RE | 1 | 24 July 2009 | 29 July 2009 |
TSE Yee Hin, Tony 謝宇軒 | RE | 6 | 24 July 2009 | 29 July 2009 |
TSEUNG Choi Wing Queenie 蔣采穎 | RE | 1 | 07 April 2011 | 30 September 2015 |
TSEUNG Choi Wing Queenie 蔣采穎 | RE | 6 | 09 July 2010 | 30 September 2015 |
TSUI Kin Wing 崔健榮 | RE | 6 | 03 August 2009 | 03 August 2009 |
TSUI Kin Wing 崔健榮 | RO | 6 | 03 August 2009 | 28 February 2011 |
TSUI Kin Wing 崔健榮 | RO | 1 | 05 October 2009 | 28 February 2011 |
WAN Ten Lap 溫天納 | RO | 6 | 28 September 2004 | 04 January 2007 |
WAN Ten Lap 溫天納 | RO | 1 | 28 September 2004 | 04 January 2007 |
WAN Ten Lap 溫天納 | RE | 6 | 03 September 2004 | 28 September 2004 |
WAN Ten Lap 溫天納 | RE | 1 | 03 September 2004 | 28 September 2004 |
WENG Eddie Hua-ti 翁華狄 | RE | 6 | 07 February 2005 | 20 December 2005 |
WONG Cheuk Ling, Elain 黃卓靈 | RO | 6 | 16 February 2023 | |
WONG Cheuk Ling, Elain 黃卓靈 | RO | 1 | 16 February 2023 | |
WONG Hoi, Michael 王海 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 20 October 2003 |
WONG Hoi, Michael 王海 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 20 October 2003 |
WONG Hoi, Michael 王海 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 20 October 2003 |
WONG Kok Yin 王覺賢 | RE | 6 | 04 January 2016 | 26 August 2019 |
WONG Mei Ying, Jenny 黃美盈 | RE | 6 | 14 February 2011 | 06 March 2013 |
WONG Sin Just 黃森捷 | RO | 6 | 13 April 2007 | 12 September 2007 |
WONG Sin Just 黃森捷 | RO | 1 | 01 April 2003 | 06 January 2006 |
WONG Sin Just 黃森捷 | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 06 January 2006 |
WONG Wai Sze 黃慧思 | RE | 6 | 10 October 2012 | 07 September 2013 |
WONG Wing Kee, Christopher 黃永基 | RE | 6 | 03 May 2004 | 13 July 2004 |
WONG Wing Kee, Christopher 黃永基 | RO | 6 | 13 July 2004 | 28 December 2004 |
WONG Wing Kee, Christopher 黃永基 | RO | 1 | 13 July 2004 | 28 December 2004 |
WONG Wing Kee, Christopher 黃永基 | RE | 1 | 03 May 2004 | 13 July 2004 |
WONG Wing Yin 黃穎妍 | RE | 6 | 26 October 2005 | 14 August 2006 |
WONG Yee Man 王綺文 | RE | 6 | 01 November 2007 | 03 October 2008 |
WU Ka Chun 胡嘉俊 | RE | 6 | 07 August 2020 | 16 October 2020 |
WU Ka Chun 胡嘉俊 | RE | 1 | 07 August 2020 | 16 October 2020 |
YAN Kam Cheong 殷鑑昌 | RE | 6 | 29 September 2003 | 13 November 2005 |
YAN Kam Cheong 殷鑑昌 | RE | 1 | 29 September 2003 | 13 November 2005 |
YAN Kam Cheong 殷鑑昌 | RE | 4 | 29 September 2003 | 20 December 2004 |
YAN Kwok Ting, Sunny 印國庭 | RE | 6 | 05 October 2005 | 25 May 2006 |
YAN Kwok Ting, Sunny 印國庭 | RO | 6 | 25 May 2006 | 23 December 2006 |
YAN Kwok Ting, Sunny 印國庭 | RO | 1 | 13 June 2006 | 23 December 2006 |
YEUNG Wing Kwan 楊穎筠 | RE | 6 | 21 May 2009 | 12 February 2010 |
YIP Hoi Wun 葉愷媛 | RE | 6 | 02 December 2014 | 30 January 2015 |
YIP Kin Kong 葉建剛 | RO | 6 | 08 October 2003 | 23 June 2005 |
YIP Kin Kong 葉建剛 | RO | 4 | 08 October 2003 | 14 December 2004 |
YIP Kin Kong 葉建剛 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 08 October 2003 |
YIP Kin Kong 葉建剛 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 08 October 2003 |
YIP Kin Kong 葉建剛 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 03 October 2003 |
YU Chi Chiu, Andrew 余志超 | RE | 6 | 01 November 2003 | 23 July 2004 |
YU Chung Hang, Lucian 余仲行 | RE | 6 | 02 July 2003 | 13 November 2003 |
YUEN Wing Yiu, Benson 袁榮耀 | RE | 6 | 30 August 2004 | 19 December 2004 |
YUM Vincent 任偉成 | RE | 6 | 11 October 2003 | 01 April 2004 |
YUM Vincent 任偉成 | RE | 4 | 11 October 2003 | 01 April 2004 |
YUM Vincent 任偉成 | RE | 1 | 11 October 2003 | 01 April 2004 |
ZHANG Chi 張弛 | RE | 6 | 18 September 2017 | 19 May 2023 |
ZHANG Chi 張弛 | RE | 1 | 18 September 2017 | 19 May 2023 |
ZHOU Jiangning 周江宁 | RE | 6 | 28 July 2017 | 26 March 2018 |
ZHOU Yan 周燕 | RE | 6 | 04 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 |